Stensrud Incorporated et al v. Unknown Parties
Plaintiff: Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated and Bad Bunny
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00334
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/29/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
February 29, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/29/2024. The Court having permitted time for Defendant(s) that were served to appear and none having appeared, IT IS ORDERED that as set forth on the record, the Court finds the Preliminary Injunction is warranted and will issue by separate order to cover the dates listed in Exhibit A of Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ). Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Kenneth Feinswog for Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 2:58 PM to 3:23 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 29, 2024 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Andrew Stensrud re: #13 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,, Terminate Motions,,, . filed by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Andrew Stensrud Declaration)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
February 29, 2024 Filing 17 DECLARATION of John Carruthers re: #13 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,, Terminate Motions,,, . filed by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the John Carruthers Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to the John Carruthers Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to the John Carruthers Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to the John Carruthers Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to the John Carruthers Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to the John Carruthers Declaration)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
February 29, 2024 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Kenneth A. Feinswog re: #13 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,, Terminate Motions,,, . filed by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Kenneth A. Feinswog Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
February 26, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated re: #13 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,, Terminate Motions,,, Notice of Bond/Security Filing. (Feinswog, Kenneth)
February 26, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: To accommodate the Court's calendar, the Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY for 2/29/2024 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER pursuant to Plaintiffs' #7 Ex Parte Motion that is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in this Order. The Temporary Restraining Order shall expire in seven (7) days and is conditioned upon the terms set forth in the attached Order, including Plaintiffs filing with the Clerk of this Court, an undertaking, a surety bond or a certified, cashiers or attorneys' check, credit card or cash in the amount of $5,000.00 no later than February 26, 2024 at 2:00 P.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED a Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 2/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/22/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 2/22/2024. IT IS ORDERED the Court will issue a TRO and set a Preliminary Injunction Hearing by separate order. APPEARANCES: Kenneth Feinswog for Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 11:00 AM to 11: 20 AM and 11:30 AM to 11:39 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Finding good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' #10 Ex Parte Motion re: Allowing Plaintiffs' Attorney to Appear Telephonically or by Videoconferencing. Plaintiffs' counsel will be provided with remote appearance instructions by separate electronic communication. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/21/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically or by video conference by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs Stensrud, Inc., and Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio a/k/a Bad Bunny"s "Ex Parte Motion for an Order to Show Cause on Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order and Order of Seizure" (Doc. #7 ). IT IS ORDERED that a Temporary Restraining Order Hearing is set for Thursday, February 22, 2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that at the Hearing, Plaintiffs shall be prepared to supplement their Memorandum of Law (Doc. #7 -7) with Ninth Circuit precedent. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/20/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiffs must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 5/15/2024. Plaintiffs must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on 5/16/2024, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/16/2024. (KJ)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Kenneth A. Feinswog, #3 Exhibit A to the Kenneth A. Feinswog Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kenneth A. Feinswog, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kenneth A. Feinswog, #6 Declaration of Andrew Stensrud, #7 Memorandum of Law)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Stensrud Incorporated, Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio. The submitted Summons is for multiple unknown defendants. Summons can only be issued for named parties, not unknown parties or entities, plus only one defendant is supposed to be listed per form. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (REK)
February 16, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22764203. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00334-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (submitted by Kenneth Feinswog) (REK)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. (submitted by Kenneth Feinswog) (REK)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22764203 filed by Stensrud Incorporated, Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio. (submitted by Kenneth Feinswog) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)
February 16, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kenneth A Feinswog on behalf of Plaintiffs Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio, Stensrud Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stensrud Incorporated et al v. Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Antonio Martinez Ocasio
Represented By: Kenneth A Feinswog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stensrud Incorporated
Represented By: Kenneth A Feinswog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bad Bunny
Represented By: Kenneth A Feinswog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?