Chambered Custom Firearms LLC et al v. Babcock
Plaintiff: Chambered Custom Firearms LLC and John Lamontagne
Defendant: Kristina Babcock
Case Number: 2:2024cv00521
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that Defendant/Respondent respond to Plaintiffs'/Petitioners' Ex Parte Motion to Deem the Petition for De Novo Review Filed on March 11, 2023 [sic] Pursuant to Section II(O)(2)(f) of this Court's Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual (Doc. #6 ) at the time of responding to the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 4/22/24. (EJA)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for May 20, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: That the Order to Show Cause Hearing set as to Chambered Custom Firearms LLC and John Lamontagne for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) scheduled for April 22, 2024 is hereby RESET to May 20, 2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. The hearing before the Judge will be automatically vacated and the party need not appear if the party files a completed election form by the 5:00 p.m. deadline set forth above. An additional copy of the election form is included with this Minute Order. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Louisa Beck re: #6 MOTION TO DEEM THE PETITION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW FILED ON MARCH 11, 2023 PURSUANT TO SECTION II(O)(2)(f) OF THIS COURTS ELECTRONIC CASE FILING ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MANUAL re: #1 Complaint, #2 New Case Opened, by Plaintiffs Chambered Custom Firearms LLC, John Lamontagne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Brunswick, Sarah)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kristina Babcock. (EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EX PARTE MOTION TO DEEM THE PETITION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW FILED ON MARCH 11, 2023 PURSUANT TO SECTION II(O)(2)(f) OF THIS COURTS ELECTRONIC CASE FILING ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MANUAL re: #1 Complaint, #2 New Case Opened, by Chambered Custom Firearms LLC, John Lamontagne. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Louisa Beck)(Brunswick, Sarah)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *SUMMONS Submitted by Chambered Custom Firearms LLC, John Lamontagne. (Brunswick, Sarah) *Modified to correct event type on 4/3/2024 (EJA).
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Chambered Custom Firearms LLC, John Lamontagne show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark: Out of state attorneys Christopher Renzulli, Jeffrey Malsch and Scott Charles Allan terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order AMENDED Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Scott Charles Allan on behalf of Plaintiffs Chambered Custom Firearms LLC, John Lamontagne - attorney incorrectly terminated for noncompliance - reinstated due to pro hac admission granted 3/22/24. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chambered Custom Firearms LLC, John Lamontagne. (Brunswick, Sarah)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22835524. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00521-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT/ Petition for De Novo Review of the Denial of an Application for a Federal Firearms License Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 923(f)(3). Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22835524 filed by John Lamontagne, Chambered Custom Firearms LLC. (submitted by Sarah Brunswick) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambered Custom Firearms LLC et al v. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chambered Custom Firearms LLC
Represented By: Sarah Brunswick
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: Christopher Renzulli
Represented By: Jeffrey Malsch
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lamontagne
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: Christopher Renzulli
Represented By: Jeffrey Malsch
Represented By: Sarah Brunswick
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?