Makuc v. Smatko et al
Plaintiff: Mary Makuc
Defendant: Gabor Smatko, Monica Smatko, Mobilityless LLC, Epizontech LLC, Fountainmoons LLC, Hillsunion LLC, Mobilitytrend LLC, Mogavike2020 LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00633
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File Reply #18 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have through May 22, 2024, to file their Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/16/2024. (REK)
May 16, 2024 Filing 18 *STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Reply i/s/o Motion to Compel Arbitration by Epizontech LLC, Fountainmoons LLC, Hillsunion LLC, Mobilityless LLC, Mobilitytrend LLC, Mogavike2020 LLC, Gabor Smatko, Monica Smatko. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Anthony) *Modified to remove "unknown parties" as a filer on 5/16/2024 (REK).
May 10, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay this Action Pending Arbitration filed by Mary Makuc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Makuc Decl., #2 Affidavit Deutsch Decl.)(Deutsch, Adam)
May 1, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay this Action Pending Arbitration by Epizontech LLC, Fountainmoons LLC, Hillsunion LLC, Mobilityless LLC, Mobilitytrend LLC, Mogavike2020 LLC, Gabor Smatko, Monica Smatko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Anthony)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the Stipulation to Extend Deadline (Doc. #14 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall have through May 1, 2024, to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/11/2024. (RMV)
April 10, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by Epizontech LLC, Fountainmoons LLC, Hillsunion LLC, Mobilityless LLC, Mobilitytrend LLC, Mogavike2020 LLC, Gabor Smatko, Monica Smatko, Unknown Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Anthony)
April 3, 2024 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Fountainmoons, LLC on 3/28/24. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 3, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Hillsunion, LLC on 3/28/24. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 3, 2024 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Mogavike2020, LLC on 3/28/24. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 3, 2024 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Monica Smatko on 3/27/24. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Mobilityless, LLC on 3/27/24. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Gabor Smatko on 3/27/2024. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mary Makuc: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Epizontech, LLC on 3/27/2024. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 27, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam Deutsch on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Makuc. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/22/2024. (RMV)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that no later than June 21, 2024, Plaintiff shall file proof of service for every defendant located in a judicial district of the United States. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/22/2024. (RMV)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Epizontech LLC, Fountainmoons LLC, Hillsunion LLC, Mobilityless LLC, Mobilitytrend LLC, Mogavike2020 LLC, Gabor Smatko, Monica Smatko. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22872360. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Roslyn O Silver. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00633-PHX-ROS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mary Makuc. (submitted by Yitzchak Zelman) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(REK)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22872360 filed by Mary Makuc. (submitted by Yitzchak Zelman) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makuc v. Smatko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Makuc
Represented By: Adam Deutsch
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabor Smatko
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Smatko
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobilityless LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epizontech LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fountainmoons LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsunion LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobilitytrend LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mogavike2020 LLC
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Megan M Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?