Hawkins et al v. Zenner et al
Plaintiff: Meredith Hawkins, Appaloosa Trail LLC, Sea Strand LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Calle Property LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC and Mere LLC
Defendant: Shonda Zenner, Thomas Zenner, Shonda K Fliehs, Shonda Moman, Shonda K Moman, Shonda Zennar, Shonda C Zenner, Shonda K Zenner, S Mohan, Thomas John Zenner, Thomas J Zenner, Thomas N Zenner, Bravda Velo LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00788
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 17 *AMENDED First MOTION to Dismiss Case 24-CV-00788 by Thomas Zenner. (Countryman, Kenneth) Modified on 6/4/2024 (KJ).
June 3, 2024 Filing 16 *AMENDED by Doc. #17 * First MOTION to Dismiss Case CV-24-00788-PHX-DJH by Shonda Zenner. (Countryman, Kenneth) Modified on 6/4/2024 (KJ).
May 29, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #14 Order to Show Cause,, Terminate Motions,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Plaintiffs Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC. (Beabeau, Olivier)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff shall show cause by 5/31/2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Motion (Doc. #12 ) and an extension until 6/3/2024 for Defendants Shonda and Thomas Zenner to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Motion for Entry of Default (Doc. #13 ) is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/23/2024. (KJ)
May 23, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Shonda Zenner, Thomas Zenner, Bravda Velo, LLC by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Beabeau, Olivier)
May 21, 2024 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shonda Zenner, Thomas Zenner. (Countryman, Kenneth)
April 23, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Service of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC re: #10 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Beabeau, Olivier)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/22/2024. (KJ)
April 22, 2024 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Order; Disclosure Statement; Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Demand for Jury Trial upon Thomas Zenner on 04/15/2024. (Beabeau, Olivier)
April 22, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Order; Disclosure Statement; Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Demand for Jury Trial upon Shonda Zenner on 04/15/2024. (Beabeau, Olivier)
April 18, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Order; Disclosure Statement; Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Demand for Jury Trial upon Bravda Vello, LLC on 4/18/2024. (Beabeau, Olivier)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 7/6/2024. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on 7/8/2024, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2024. (KJ)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bravda Velo LLC, Shonda Zenner, Thomas Zenner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22926488. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00788-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC. (submitted by Olivier Beabeau) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Calle Property LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Mere LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Sea Strand LLC. (submitted by Olivier Beabeau) (REK)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22926488 filed by Appaloosa Trail LLC, Ocean Dr Property LLC, Calle Property LLC, Sea Gull LLC, Meredith Hawkins, Sea Strand LLC, Mere LLC. (submitted by Olivier Beabeau) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins et al v. Zenner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda K Fliehs
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda Moman
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda K Moman
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda Zennar
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda C Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonda K Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Mohan
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas John Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N Zenner
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravda Velo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Hawkins
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Appaloosa Trail LLC
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Strand LLC
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Gull LLC
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calle Property LLC
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Dr Property LLC
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mere LLC
Represented By: Michael F Ruppert
Represented By: Olivier Andre Beabeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?