Anderson v. Mesa Install Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sam E Anderson
Defendant: Mesa Install Company LLC, Aire 1 LLC, Joseph Garcia, Jessica Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Unknown Garcia and Jennifer Garcia
Case Number: 2:2024cv00958
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W. Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-00958-PHX-DWL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 24, 2024 Filing 19 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesa Install Company LLC. (Curran, Christopher)
May 24, 2024 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aire 1 LLC. (Curran, Christopher)
May 24, 2024 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aire 1 LLC, Christopher Garcia, Jennifer Garcia, Jessica Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Mesa Install Company LLC.(Curran, Christopher)
May 14, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: That the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for June 3, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 13, 2024 Filing 13 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Sam E Anderson show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
May 9, 2024 Filing 10 Service Returned Unexecuted by Sam E Anderson : Complaint and Summons as to Jane Doe Garcia. (Bendau, Clifford)
May 9, 2024 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sam E Anderson: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Christopher Garcia on 5/4/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sam E Anderson: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Jessica Garcia on 5/5/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sam E Anderson: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Joseph Garcia on 5/5/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sam E Anderson: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Aire 1 LLC on 5/5/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
May 9, 2024 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sam E Anderson: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Mesa Install Company LLC on 5/5/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aire 1 LLC, Christopher Garcia, Jennifer Garcia, Jessica Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Unknown Garcia(named as: John Doe Garcia), Unknown Garcia(named as: Jane Doe Garcia), Mesa Install Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22988212. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00958-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Sam E Anderson. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(REK)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22988212 filed by Sam E Anderson. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Mesa Install Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam E Anderson
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Install Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher John Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aire 1 LLC
Represented By: Christopher John Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Garcia
Represented By: Christopher John Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Garcia
Represented By: Christopher John Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Garcia
Represented By: Christopher John Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Garcia
Represented By: Christopher John Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?