El Paso Natural Gas Company v. Southwest Forest Products, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04068
Filed: December 13, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice 56 . FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this case, including all counterclaims therein with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the status hearing set for Wednesday, 2/11/09 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/9/2009. (LAD)
December 4, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Joint Notice of Withdrawal to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal 52 . Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/3/08. (TLJ)
October 29, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Joint Status Report and Motion to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the parteies have until 11/14/08 to file supplemental information regarding the need for sealing the settlementagreement. FURTHER ORDERED VACATING the Status Hearing scheduled for 11/3/08, at 1:30p.m. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/08.(MAP)
September 16, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties have until 10/27/08 to file a stipulation for dismissal of this action signed by all parties. In the event that no such stipulation is filed, the parties shall attend a Status Conference set for 11/3/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. If the stipulation is received by 10/27/08, the status conference will automatically be vacated. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/16/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Paso Natural Gas Company v. Southwest Forest Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?