Riley et al v. Bullhead City, City of et al

Plaintiff: Ashton Riley, Grant Riley and Jon Riley
Defendant: Bullhead City, City of, Bradley Holdway, Ryan Abel, John Does and Black & White Corps I-X
Case Number: 3:2007cv00692
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY Status Conference set for 12/14/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/3/2009. (TCA, )
July 16, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER trial date of 8/4/09 is VACATED. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/15/09. (LSP)
March 18, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Continue. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt and Jury Trial set for 8/4/2009 09:00 AM in U.S. Post Office Building, Second Floor, 101 W, Goodwin Street, Prescott, AZ 86303 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/18/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. Bullhead City, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Riley
Represented By: Cameron A Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Riley
Represented By: Cameron A Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Riley
Represented By: Cameron A Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullhead City, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Holdway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & White Corps I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?