United States of America v. Winslow, City of et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Winslow, City of, William R. Christie, Sr. and John Roche
Case Number: 3:2007cv08024
Filed: June 1, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413(b) Clean Air Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's Unopposed 30 Motion to Enter Consent Decree. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Consent Decree that was lodged with the Court on September 17, 2008 (Doc. 28, Attachment 1-Proposed Consent Decree). FURTH ER ORDERED that the Consent Decree is APPROVED, and shall become effective upon entry of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Consent Decree resolves the civil claims of the United States for violations alleged in the Complaint filed in this action. However, the Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction to resolve disputes arising under the Consent Decree, enter orders modifying it, or ensure its enforcement. See Consent Decree at 6:4-5,8:15-18. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/08.(KMG, )
October 20, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States has until Friday, October 31, 2008, to advise the Court whether the Consent Decree should be entered. Case Management Deadline set for 10/31/2008.Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/17/08. (SAT)
September 2, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Stay. Stay Deadline set for 10/2/2008.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/2/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Winslow, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sue A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winslow, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Christie, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?