Reidhead et al v. Meyers et al

Plaintiff: Jean Reidhead, Reidhead Sand & Rock, Inc. and Patrick Kent Reidhead
Defendant: Joseph P. Meyers, Apache Mining Co. and Caribbean Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv08027
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Logan's 153 R&R is accepted. Judgment Creditor's 1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons is discharged as to the monies withheld in the amount of $1,700. Judgment Creditor is directed to submit a propose d form of judgment within thirty (30) days of this Order, setting forth the manner by which the shares of stock will be sold under execution, up to a total amount in worth of $1,091,192.50. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/21/2013. (LFIG)
July 30, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 84 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/29/10.(KSP)
June 8, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Caribbean Financial Corporation's 76 Motion; the Motion for Default Judgment is granted, the Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as moot; directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/7/10.(REW)
December 10, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that all Counts of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 32 FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Attorneys ' Fees Pursuant to A.R.S. §§ 12-341.01(C) and 12-349 is GRANTED IN PART. 33 ). Defendants' request for attorneys' fees incurred in association with their prior pleadings to date is DENIED. Defendants' request for attorn eys' fees incurred in association with the instant Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/10/08.(DNH) Modified on 12/11/2008 THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS INCORRECT FROM THE DOCKET TEXT (that all Counts of Plas' Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED "WITH" PREJUDICE.)(KMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reidhead et al v. Meyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Meyers
Represented By: Rick Neeley Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Mining Co.
Represented By: Rick Neeley Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Financial Corporation
Represented By: Rick Neeley Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Reidhead
Represented By: Bernald C Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reidhead Sand & Rock, Inc.
Represented By: Bernald C Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kent Reidhead
Represented By: Bernald C Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?