Saunders v. Yavapai County et al

Plaintiff: Carole Saunders
Defendant: Yavapai County, R. Silva, Jane Doe Silva, Katherine Blaylock and John Doe Blaylock
Case Number: 3:2007cv08029
Filed: June 6, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that each party file a memorandum addressing the issues in this order byNovember 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 10/18/10. (DMT)
September 17, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Having considered the Parties' 166 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time, IT IS ORDERED that parties have until Thursday, 9/23/2010 to file their Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 9/17/10. (SAT)
November 6, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. ORDER that this action will proceed on Plaintiff's 42:1983 claim against Defendant Richard Silva for violating Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment right to be free from unreasonable searches and seizures. All other claims and Defendants are dismissed. ORDER Defendant Richard Silva shall file an answer to Plaintiff's remaining claim within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 11/5/09.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Yavapai County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Saunders
Represented By: William Benjamin Fortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?