BNSF Railway Company v. Coconino Land & Cattle LLC, et al

Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: Coconino Land & Cattle LLC, John Doe, Jane Doe, XYZ Corporations, 123 Partnerships and ABC Trusts
Case Number: 3:2007cv08068
Filed: August 3, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' 275 Stipulation: ORDERED releasing the $1,000 cost bond posted October 1, 2009, by Coconino Land & Cattle, LLC. The funds shall be made payable to counsel, Anthony H. Misseldine, in trust for Coconino Land & Cattle, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/22/2013. (LFIG)
September 19, 2011 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying the motions without prejudice. (Docs. 138, 202, 209, 211, 245, 257, and 261). (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/19/11.(LAD)
July 5, 2011 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Oral argument on all pending motions set for 7/13/2011 vacated.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/5/2011. (TCA)
April 4, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Conference set for 5/2/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the 4/19/11 oral argument hearing date.Oral argument on all pending motions will be heard on 5/23/11 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/4/11. (MAP)
February 16, 2011 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 237 Motion for Leave to File Surreplies.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/16/2011.(TCA)
February 9, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Status Conference for 2/14/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Counsel may appear telephonically. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/8/11. (LSP)
November 30, 2010 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 229 and 233 Coconino's Motions to Strike BNSF's Objections. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Coconino's request to file a separate response. In the event that Coconino desires permission to file a surreply, Coconino must file a motion for leave demonstrating a proper basis for such a filing. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/29/10.(LSP)
April 5, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 158 MOTION to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Conduct Settlement Conference by Coconino Land & Cattle LLC. (Combs, C) filed by Coconino Land & Cattle LLC. Plaintiff has until 4/9/2010 to file written notice with the Court whether amenable to appointment of Magistrate Judge for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/5/2010. (TCA) Modified on 4/6/2010 (JEMB TO INDICATE WO).
March 15, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice BNSF's 117 Motion to Compel Discovery and for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/15/10.(REW)
May 26, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING the 80 Joint Motion for a Scheduling Conference. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING the parties' request to set a telephonic status conference in the event the Court denied the current motion. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/26/09. (SAT)
March 26, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. DENYING BNSF's Motion for Summary Judgment seeking judgment quieting its title to the Subject Right of Way. DENYING BNSF's Motion for Summary Judgment as to all of Coconino's claims and counterclaims except Equitable/Implied Easement. GRANTING BNSF's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Coconino's claim for Equitable/Implied Easement. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/25/09.(DMT, )
December 18, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff BNSF shall file its Reply no later than 1/7/09. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/17/08.(LSP)
September 24, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to the extent that the Pretrial Conference set for September 29, 2008, the deadline for filing proposed findings and conclusions and trial briefs, and the trial set for October 21, 2008, are all vacated. Defendants Request for 60 Day Stay 66 is granted to the extent that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment no later than December 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/23/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. Coconino Land & Cattle LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coconino Land & Cattle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 123 Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Trusts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Alexander R Arpad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?