Parenteau et al v. Prescott Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: Jolene Parenteau and Raymond Parenteau
Defendant: Prescott Unified School District, Kevin J Kapp and Unknown Parties
Garnishee: Bank of Arizona and Arizona Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2007cv08072
Filed: August 10, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; IT IS ORDERED granting 178 Motion to Compel Compliance with Court's January 11, 2010 Order. Setting a show cause hearing before the undersigned on Monday, March 8, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. for Gary L. Lassen to show cause why thi s Court should not recommend to Judge Wake that Gary L. Lassen should be found in indirect, civil contempt, arrested by the U.S. Marshal Service pursuant to a civil arrest warrant, and detained until he fully complies with prior court orders includin g finishing his judgement-debtor examination. That Gary L. Lassen shall be physically present at the March 8, 2010 show cause hearing. That Defendants shall file under seal before the March 8, 2010 hearing all personal information they may have in their possession regarding Gary L. Lassen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/1/10.(DMT) DOCKET MODIFIED TO CORRECT TYPE OF ORDER FROM (ORDER) TO (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) ON 3/2/2010 (MHU).
December 9, 2009 163 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 147 MOTION for Protective Order: Recommending that that the Motion be granted in part and denied in part. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/8/2009. (LAD)
July 17, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion 93 for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-taxable Expenses is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees in opposing Defendants' Motion is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/17/09.(KMG, )
March 4, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the claims in Plas' 1 Complaint that were not directly adjudicated in the 80 order of 12/11/08, are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; that Pla's 81 Motion to Amend Compl aint is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment on Count One of the Complaint under the IDEA affirming the Administrative Law Judge Decision dated 05/14/07, in No. 07C-DP-07019-ADE, and dismissing with prejudice the remaining claims in this action. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 03/03/09. (ESL)
December 11, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING PLAS' IDEA CLAIM AND ORDER: ORDERED that plas' appeal under the IDEA from the Administrative Law Judge Decision dated 5/14/07, in No. 07C-DP-07019-ADE, is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that plas s how cause by 12/24/08 why the remainder of the complaint beyond count 1 (Violation of IDEA) should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upo which relief can be granted. Dfts may file a response by 1/16/09 and plas may file a reply by 1/23/09. Show Cause Response due by 12/24/2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/11/2008. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parenteau et al v. Prescott Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Parenteau
Represented By: William R Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Parenteau
Represented By: William R Hobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Unified School District
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J Kapp
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bank of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Arizona Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?