Madrid v. Concho Elementary School District No. 6 of Apache County et al

Plaintiff: Manuel Madrid
Defendant: Concho Elementary School District No. 6 of Apache County, John Does I-V, Jane Does I-V and Black and White Corporations I-V
Case Number: 3:2007cv08103
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Gallagher & Kennedy is awarded $1,716.19 in arbitrator's fees; defendants are awarded $34,194.55 in attorneys' fees to reimburse Arizona School Risk Retention Trust, Inc. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/30/2011.(NVO)
July 26, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 77 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/26/2010.(NVO)
May 17, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/17/10.(DMT)
April 29, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Dfts' 51 Motion to confirm arbitration award. The Court will set a scheduling conference by separate order. The parties shall address the § 12-133 issues identified above in the joint filing made before the scheduling conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/28/09.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrid v. Concho Elementary School District No. 6 of Apache County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Madrid
Represented By: Gary L Lassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concho Elementary School District No. 6 of Apache County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Corporations I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?