Grand Canyon Trust v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, et al

Case Number: 3:2007cv08164
Filed: December 7, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2011 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 291 Motion for injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/27/2011.(NVO)
March 30, 2011 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED. 1. The Trust's motion to vacate (Doc. 265) is denied.2. The Trust's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 266) is denied. 3. Summary judgment is granted to Defendants on Claims 3, 12, and 13. 4. This ruling resolves all o utstanding claims in this case. The Court's decisions in Trust I, II, III and this order are deemed final judgments for purposes of appeal. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/11. (LAD)
February 10, 2011 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 276 Motion to Vacate. Telephonic status conference set for 2/18/2011 at 2:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall arrange for the conference call with all parties and the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/10/2011.(NVO)
December 29, 2010 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 275 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw and denying as moot 265 Motion to Vacate and denying as moot 266 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/29/10.(LSP)
August 16, 2010 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 248 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/16/2010.(NVO)
June 29, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 224 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 226 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 235 Motion for Leave to File; granting 239 Motion; granting 240 Motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/29/2010.(NVO)
March 9, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re in camera review of documents. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/9/2010. (NVO)
February 5, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 200 Motion re release of documents withheld from the administrative record. FWS shall provide copies of the withheld documents to the Court for in cmera review on or before 2/12/2010.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/5/2010.(NVO)
January 7, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 190 Motion to Supplement. Plaintiff shall file the second supplemental complaint on or before 1/27/2010; Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before 2/10/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/2010.(NVO)
May 26, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 165 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/26/2009.(NVO)
April 6, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion to consider extra-record evidence. Plaintiff's request for in camera review is granted. Defendants are directed to submit documents for in camera review by 4/10/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/2009.(NVO)
November 11, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 124 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/11/2008.(NVJ)
September 26, 2008 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to claims 4 and 5 of Plaintiff's supplemental complaint. The motion with respect to claims 1, 2, and 3 will be decided after briefing is completed on claims 6, 7, and 8; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims with respect to claims 4 and 5, and denying (to the extent it seeks dismissal) with respect to claims 1, 2, and 3. See order for additional briefing schedule and requirements. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Canyon Trust v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?