Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation v. Company 81, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation
Defendant: Company 81, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv08009
Filed: January 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that pursuant to the parties' 35 Stipulation of Dismissal: dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/1/09. (KMG, )
April 30, 2009 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal)(Clapp, Fritz)
March 31, 2009 Filing 34 Notice re Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation re 25 Other Notice (Clapp, Fritz)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Compel; Plaintiff shall produce the documents and respond to the interrogatories, without objection, by 3/31/09; the Requests for Admissions provided to Plaintiff shall be deemed admitted if not otherwise responded to by 3/31/09; Plaintiff shall pay Defendant $2,000.00 for the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs associated with preparing and presenting Defendants' motion. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/26/09.(REW, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 32 REPLY in Support re 29 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Company 81, LLC. (Rader, Jennifer)
March 19, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation, a California corporation in place of Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation, a Nevada corporation as Plaintiff by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Clapp, Fritz)
March 16, 2009 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Clapp, Fritz)
March 9, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Company 81, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rader, Jennifer)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying the 26 Stipulation without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/18/08. (DMT, )
December 18, 2008 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 26 Stipulation Proposed Order by Plaintiff Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (Clapp, Fritz)
December 10, 2008 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Protective Order re Confidentiality by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (Clapp, Fritz)
October 22, 2008 Filing 25 Notice re Notice of Service of Defendant Company 81's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation by Company 81, LLC (Rader, Jennifer)
September 4, 2008 Filing 24 The court has ORDERED this case reassigned to Judge G. Murray Snow who is newly-appointed to the District of Arizona. The reassignment is effective September 8, 2008. Judge Snow's docket is created from cases randomly-drawn from other judges in the Phoenix Division. As a result of combining cases that have been calendared on the dockets other judges, Judge Snow may be required to make future scheduling adjustments in this case. If, however, the Court does not otherwise provide notice of a change in the date or time of a hearing currently scheduled by the Court to which this matter was previously assigned, the parties should appear in Judge Snow's court for the hearing as scheduled. Any case deadlines remain unaffected by this order. Cases that have previously been referred to Magistrate Judges remain assigned to the Magistrate Judge receiving the referral. Any hearings in such matters scheduled by the Magistrate Judge remain unaffected by this Order. In such cases the parties should appear before the Magistrate Judge as scheduled. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/17/2009. Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2009. Bench Trial set for 9/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Earl H Carroll. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Earl H Carroll. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 7/22/08. (SAT)
July 21, 2008 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Earl H Carroll. APPEARANCES BY TELEPHONE: Fritz Clapp for Plaintiff; and Robert Dace and Jennifer Rader for Defendant. APPEARANCE IN PERSON: Margaret Gillespie for Daniel Collins for Defendant. Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2008. Order to follow setting forth case management deadlines.(Court Reporter Candy Potter.)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)(KAR)
July 10, 2008 Filing 21 Notice re Notice of Service of Defendant Company 81 LLC's Initial Disclosures by Company 81, LLC (Rader, Jennifer)
July 9, 2008 Filing 20 Notice re Service of Initial Disclosures by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation (Clapp, Fritz)
July 9, 2008 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) conference by Plaintiff Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation, Defendant Company 81, LLC. (Clapp, Fritz)
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 IT IS ORDERED setting a Scheduling Conference for MONDAY, 7/21/2008 at 02:30 PM before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Ordered by Judge Earl H. Carroll on 5/28/08. (BAH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Company 81, LLC. (Rader, Jennifer)
May 23, 2008 Filing 16 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Company 81, LLC.(Rader, Jennifer)
April 25, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. Party Stage Stores, Inc terminated. (Clapp, Fritz)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 4, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX069681 as to Robert W Dace. (BAS, )
April 4, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX069680 as to Jennifer B Rader. (BAS, )
April 3, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer B Rader on behalf of Company 81, LLC, and Stage Stores, Inc. (BAS, )
April 3, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert W Dace on behalf of Company 81, LLC, and Stage Stores, Inc. (BAS, )
March 25, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Collins on behalf of Company 81, LLC, Stage Stores, Inc (Collins, Daniel)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re 1 Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before May 26, 2008. Company 81, LLC answer due 5/26/2008; Stage Stores, Inc answer due 5/26/2008.. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 3/20/08. (DMT, )
March 19, 2008 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re 1 Complaint \Stipulation to Extend Date for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Company 81, LLC, Stage Stores, Inc. (Collins, Daniel)
February 20, 2008 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. Stage Stores, Inc waiver sent on 1/22/2008. (Clapp, Fritz)
February 20, 2008 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. Company 81, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2008. (Clapp, Fritz)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 18, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Company 81, LLC and Stage Stores, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Company 81, # 2 Notice of Availability form)(HIH). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
January 18, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX066817 as to Fritz Clapp. (BAS, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Fritz Clapp on behalf of Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (BAS, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (DMT, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 2 Notice re Summons re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(HIH)
January 17, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number PHX066867, filed by Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HIH)
January 17, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Earl H. Carroll. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV08-08009-PCT-EHC. (entered by HIH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation v. Company 81, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hells Angels Motorcycle Corporation
Represented By: Fritz Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company 81, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?