Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District et al v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Headwaters Resources, Inc. and Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Defendant: Louise G. Grant, Evelyn Meadows, Herb Yazzie, Leonard Thinn, Sarah Gonnie, Reynold R. Lee, Casey Watchman, Woody Lee, Peterson Yazzie and Eleanor Shirley
Case Number: 3:2008cv08028
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 169 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' 162 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED denying Defendants' 167 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall enter de claratory judgment for Plaintiffs Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District, a municipal corporation and political subdivision of the State of Arizona, and Headwaters Resources, Inc., a Utah corporation, against Defendants Reyno ld R. Lee, Casey Watchman, Woody Lee, Peterson Yazzie, Evelyn Meadows, Honorable Herb Yazzie, Honorable Louise G. Grant, Honorable Eleanor Shirley, Leonard Thinn and Sarah Gonnie: the Court hereby declares that Defendants (1) may not apply the NPEA t o or enforce it against SRP, the other Participants and/or their contractors (including Headwaters) at NGS; and (2) may not regulate, through tribal proceeding or otherwise, except as provided by the 1969 Lease, the operation of NGS by SRP, the other Participants and/or their contractors (including Headwaters) related to employment matters. Permanent injunction to follow. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/28/2013.(LFIG)
December 2, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Navajo Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 115 SRP's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and granting 125 Navajo Defendants' Rule 19(b) Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 119 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 127 Navajo Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/2/10.(LSP)
March 11, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Pending before the Court is Plaintiff SRP's 91 Rule 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. The Court will grant Pla's motion for reconsideration to the limited extent to make clear that the Court did not order the Secretary of t he Interior to decide the dispute between SRP and the Dfts. Rather, the Court ordered that if the Pla chooses to pursue its action, it must do so before the Secretary of the Interior, as set out in the 1969 Lease. The Court denies the Rule 59(e) Motion (Doc. #91) in all other respects. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/11/09. (SAT)
January 14, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. The case is dismissed in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that if plas continue to pursue an action before the Secretary, they shall provide the Secretary with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/13/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District et al v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise G. Grant
Represented By: Katherine Louise DeStefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Meadows
Represented By: Rhonda Lorraine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Yazzie
Represented By: Rhonda Lorraine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Thinn
Represented By: David Robert Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Gonnie
Represented By: David Robert Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynold R. Lee
Represented By: Rhonda Lorraine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Watchman
Represented By: Rhonda Lorraine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Lee
Represented By: Rhonda Lorraine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Yazzie
Represented By: Rhonda Lorraine Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Shirley
Represented By: Katherine Louise DeStefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Headwaters Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Represented By: John James Egbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?