Allstate Insurance Company v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America, Black and White Partnerships, XYZ Corporations, L-N Limited Liability Companies, John Does and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2008cv08034
Filed: March 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1346 Tort Claim

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that the matter is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and fees re order 23 . Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/3/08. (TLJ)
December 1, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and fees re stipulation 41 . Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/1/08. (TLJ)
November 3, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion for Scheduling Order. Discovery must be completed by 3/27/09. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 4/10/09. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/3/2008.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: David Thomas Bonfiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L-N Limited Liability Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?