Wolfson v. Brammer, et al
Plaintiff: Randolph Wolfson
Defendant: Colleen Concannon, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig, Peter J Eckerstrom, Timothy Gooding, Lloyd K Claycomb, Maret Vessella, Sherry L Geisler, Angela H Sifuentes, Daisy R Flores, Pamela M Katzenberg, Lawrence F Winthrop, John C Gemmill, Robert B Van Wyck, Harriett Chavez, J Conrad Baran, J Tyrell Taber, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Catherine M Stewart, Louis Frank Dominguez, Robert M Brutinel, Michael O Miller, Linda Houle, Sheila S Polk, George H Foster, William W Horsley, J William Brammer, Jr., Laura Bellau and Jeff Messing
Case Number: 3:2008cv08064
Filed: May 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2016 Filing 106 MANDATE of USCA affirming District Court decision, re: 11-17634 as to #98 Notice of Appeal filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order, #3 NDA) (ATD)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #103 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Filing Motion for Attorneys' fees. (See attached order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/21/14.(JAMA)
May 21, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Errata re: #103 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Plaintiff Randolph Wolfson. (Gallant, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2014 Filing 103 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallant, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #101 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 10, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX142870 as to Jeffrey P Gallant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 10, 2014 Filing 101 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffrey P Gallant on behalf of Randolph Wolfson. (BAS)
November 7, 2011 Filing 100 Representation Statement by Randolph Wolfson re #98 Notice of Appeal . (Woudenberg, Anita)
November 2, 2011 Filing 99 Ninth Circuit Case Number 11-17634 for #98 Notice of Appeal. (DMT)
October 31, 2011 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #96 Clerk's Judgment, #95 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Randolph Wolfson. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-5998777. (Woudenberg, Anita)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Josiah Simpson Neeley terminated. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/7/11. (LSP)
September 29, 2011 Filing 96 CLERK'S JUDGMENT, pursuant to the Court's Order of September 29, 2011, granting the Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff shall take nothing by way of the Complaint. The Complaint and this action are hereby dismissed. (REW)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER, denying Wolfson's #69 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting the Commission Members' #71 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Bar Counsel's #75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying the Disciplinary Commission's #73 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/29/11.(REW)
September 27, 2011 Filing 94 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Neeley, Josiah)
May 9, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE re Supreme Court Action in Related Cases by Maret Vessella re #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commission Member Defendants, #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #91 Reply to Response to Motion, #86 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #84 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #69 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment, #89 Reply to Response to Motion, #92 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit May 2, 2011 Order List)(Demarchi, Kimberly)
March 25, 2011 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
March 21, 2011 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commission Member Defendants filed by Colleen Concannon, Louis Frank Dominguez, Peter J Eckerstrom, George H Foster, Sherry L Geisler, Michael O Miller, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, J Tyrell Taber, Lawrence F Winthrop. (Grube, Charles)
March 21, 2011 Filing 90 Reply re #82 Statement of Supporting Facts of Bar Counsel Defendant by Defendant Maret Vessella. (Demarchi, Kimberly)
March 21, 2011 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maret Vessella. (Demarchi, Kimberly)
March 18, 2011 Filing 88 *NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Randolph Wolfson. Party Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, John Pressley Todd, Laura Bellau, Lloyd K Claycomb, Linda Houle and Daisy R Flores terminated. (Neeley, Josiah) Modified to terminate additional parties on 3/21/2011* (REW).
March 7, 2011 Filing 87 STATEMENT (Separate) of Facts Oppsing re #70 Statement of Supporting Facts by Defendants J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles) Modified on 3/8/2011 to correct event. (KMG).
March 7, 2011 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles)
March 7, 2011 Filing 85 RESPONSE re #70 Statement State Bar Counsel's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Supporting Facts by Defendant Maret Vessella. (Demarchi, Kimberly) Modified on 3/8/2011 as to filer. (KMG).
March 7, 2011 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Disciplinary Commission Members, #69 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment, #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commission Member Defendants Consolidated Response of State Bar Counsel to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Maret Vessella. (Demarchi, Kimberly) Modified on 3/8/2011 as to filer. (KMG).
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - Automatic substitution under Rule 25(d) applies to ministerial replacements to the same public office, not to new public officers created by organizational changes. We therefore construe plaintiff's motion for substitution as a motion for leave to amend the complaint to delete the Disciplinary Commission Members and allegations relating to them, and add the Presiding Disciplinary Judge and allegations as to that office. So construed, the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. 67). Plaintiff may file an amended complaint accomplishing this no later than March 18, 2011. However, plaintiff is advised he need not join the Presiding Disciplinary Judge to obtain complete relief in this case. Doing so, therefore, may be more trouble than it is worth. Meanwhile, all parties, and the clerk's office, are instructed to use the replaced names for the members of the Commission on Judicial Conduct (see doc.68), the members of the Disciplinary Commission (see doc.65 at 2), and the Chief Bar Counsel (see doc.66) for all later filings. Rule 25(d), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/4/11.(KMG)
March 3, 2011 Filing 82 STATEMENT of of Controverting Facts to Bar Counsel re #76 Statement by Plaintiff Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
March 3, 2011 Filing 81 STATEMENT of of Controverting Facts to Disciplinary Commission Defendants re #74 Statement, by Plaintiff Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
March 3, 2011 Filing 80 STATEMENT of of Controverting Facts to Commission Defendants re #72 Statement, by Plaintiff Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
March 3, 2011 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Disciplinary Commission Members, #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commission Member Defendants filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
February 8, 2011 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting William O'Neil, in his official capacity as Presiding Disciplinary Judge in place of all members of the Arizona Disciplinary Commission filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
February 1, 2011 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting William O'Neil, in his official capacity as Presiding Disciplinary Judge in place of all members of the Arizona Disciplinary Commission filed by J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles)
February 1, 2011 Filing 76 STATEMENT re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summay Judgment by Defendant Robert B Van Wyck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Demarchi, Kimberly)
February 1, 2011 Filing 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert B Van Wyck. (Demarchi, Kimberly)
February 1, 2011 Filing 74 STATEMENT of Facts Supporting Separate Motion for Summary Judgment by Disciplinary Commission Member Defendants by Defendants Laura Bellau, Daisy R Flores, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, John Pressley Todd. (Grube, Charles)
February 1, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Disciplinary Commission Members by Laura Bellau, Daisy R Flores, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd Karen Osborne, and Linda Houle. (Grube, Charles) Modified on 2/2/2011 (DMT). CORRECTED to add filers
February 1, 2011 Filing 72 STATEMENT of Facts Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles)
February 1, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commission Member Defendants by J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles)
February 1, 2011 Filing 70 STATEMENT of Facts Supporting Second Motion for Summary Judgment re #69 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
February 1, 2011 Filing 69 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
January 25, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE re Amended Notice re Substitution of Parties by J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles)
January 18, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting William O'Neil, in his official capacity as Presiding Disciplinary Judge in place of all members of the Arizona Disciplinary Commission by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Order 2010-83-, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Neeley, Josiah)
January 14, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE by Robert B Van Wyck re #62 Order, Set Deadlines Suggestion of Substitution of Parties Pursuant to Rule 25(d). (Demarchi, Kimberly)
January 14, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE re Suggested Substitution of Parties by J Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W Horsley, Pamela M Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig. (Grube, Charles)
December 15, 2010 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by J. Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J. William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W. Horsley, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M. Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Marion Weinzweig.(Grube, Charles)
December 15, 2010 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer to Verified Complaint For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Robert B Van Wyck.(Demarchi, Kimberly)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Defendants' Answer shall be filed on or before 12/15/10. Dispositive motions due by 2/1/2011.. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/17/10. (TLJ)
November 5, 2010 Filing 61 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting re 60 Telephone Conference, Joint Proposed Case Management Plan by J. Conrad Baran, Laura Bellau, J. William Brammer, Jr, Robert M Brutinel, Harriett Chavez, Louis Frank Dominguez, Daisy R Flores, Sherry L Geisler, John C Gemmill, Timothy Gooding, William W. Horsley, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Jeff Messing, Karen Osborne, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Sheila S Polk, Angela H Sifuentes, Catherine M. Stewart, John Pressley Todd, Robert B Van Wyck, Marion Weinzweig, Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah) Modified on 11/8/2010 (DMT). CORRECTED from Stipulation.
October 22, 2010 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 10/22/2010 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Appearances by telephone: Josiah Neely for Plaintiffs; and Charles Grube and Kimberly Demarchi for Defendants. Telephone Conference held. Case status discussed. Parties shall submit their proposed case management plan by November 5, 2010.(Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAR)
September 16, 2010 Filing 59 Minute Order: The court ORDERS setting a Telephone Conference for 10/22/2010 at 3:30 PM (MST) in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Counsel shall contact chambers just prior to the hearing time at 602-322-7590. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAR)
September 8, 2010 Filing 58 MANDATE of USCA that the decision of the District Court is REVERSED AND REMANDED as to #49 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randolph Wolfson (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 nda)(KMG)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER of Ninth Circuit by Judge McKeown regarding motion for recusal as to #49 Notice of Appeal, appeal case number 09-15298 filed by Randolph. (ESL)
October 23, 2009 Filing 56 Notice of Attorney Substitution by Kimbery Anne Demarchi. Peter Robert Wand for Robert B Van Wyck terminating Peter D Baird and Kate Colleen Shaw. (Demarchi, Kimberly) Modified on 10/26/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Notice) TO (Notice of Attorney Substitution) ATTORNEY ADDED AND ATTORNEYS TERMINATED (KMG).
March 3, 2009 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #49 Notice of Appeal. (LSP)
February 27, 2009 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Randolph Wolfson for proceedings held on 09/04/2008 before Judge Martone, re #49 Notice of Appeal, (Neeley, Josiah)
February 25, 2009 Filing 53 Notice re Notice Pursuant to 9th Cir. Rule 10-3.1 by Randolph Wolfson (Neeley, Josiah)
February 23, 2009 Filing 52 Notice re Notice Pursuant to 9th Cir. R. 10-3.1 by Randolph Wolfson (Neeley, Josiah)
February 19, 2009 CADS Sent re #49 Notice of Appeal, Civil Appeals Docketing Statement sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (REW, )
February 19, 2009 Filing 51 Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-15298 for #49 Notice of Appeal (REW, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 50 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: #49 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randolph Wolfson. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *2/13/2009*, *Complaint* *5/21/2008*, Appealed Order *1/15/09*, Appealed Judgment *1/15/09*. Court Reporter *Linda Schroeder (602) 322-7249* Fee Status: *Paid on 2/13/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Josiah Simpson Neeley* *(ret)* *jneeley@bopplaw.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Charles Arnold Grube, Kimberly Anne Demarchi* *(ret)* *AdminLaw@azag.gov, KDemarchi@lrlaw.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (KMG, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #48 Clerk's Judgment, #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Randolph Wolfson. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002575747. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement, #2 Docketing Statement, #3 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Neeley, Josiah)
January 15, 2009 Filing 48 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court having granted the Motions to Dismiss, this action is hereby dismissed. (LAD)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #20 Motion to Dismiss Case on grounds of mootness; denying #35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/14/2009. (LAD)
December 19, 2008 Filing 46 REPLY in Support re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Brief on Mootness filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Wolfson is now ordered to file, within 5 days from the date of this order, a supplement to #44 REPLY in Support re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment answering the following question: Will you be a candidate for judicial office in the next election? Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/15/08. (LSP)
November 25, 2008 Filing 44 REPLY in Support re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply to Bar Counsel filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
November 25, 2008 Filing 43 REPLY in Support re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply to Commission Defendants filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
November 10, 2008 Filing 42 STATEMENT of Statement of Facts Opposing Summary Judgment re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy R Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez. (Grube, Charles)
November 10, 2008 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy R Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez. (Grube, Charles)
November 10, 2008 Filing 40 STATEMENT re #39 Response in Opposition to Motion, #36 Proposed Findings of Fact, Defendant Van Wyck's Controverting Statement of Facts by Defendant Robert B Van Wyck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Demarchi, Kimberly) Modified on 11/12/2008 (LAD). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED.
November 10, 2008 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Van Wyck's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert B Van Wyck. (Demarchi, Kimberly)
October 17, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, )
October 17, 2008 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Oral Argument held on 9/4/08 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2009. (BAS, )
October 6, 2008 Filing 36 STATEMENT of Supporting Facts re #35 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah) Modified on 10/7/2008, INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Proposed Findings of Fact" TO "Statement", (LSP).
October 6, 2008 Filing 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/22/08.(SAT)
September 17, 2008 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Randolph Wolfson for proceedings held on 09/04/2008 before Judge Martone. (Neeley, Josiah)
September 4, 2008 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederick J Martone: Oral Argument held on plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 and defendants Motions to Dismiss [19 and 20]. The matter is taken under advisement. The Court will issue written findings.(Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.)(KAR)
August 25, 2008 Filing 31 REPLY in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy R Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez. (Grube, Charles)
August 25, 2008 Filing 30 REPLY in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Van Wyck's Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Defendant Van Wyck's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert B Van Wyck. (Demarchi, Kimberly)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Hearing set as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case and #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2008 at 02:00PM before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/18/08. (LSP)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER pursuant to #27 Stipulation : the existing deadline for Dft Van Wyck to reply to his Motion to Dismiss is extended until 8/25/08. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/15/08. (LSP)
August 14, 2008 Filing 27 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines to Reply to Defendant Van Wyck's Motion to Dismiss by Robert B Van Wyck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, Kate)
August 5, 2008 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
August 5, 2008 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Van Wyck's Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
July 28, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Byron Jeffords Babione (Babione, Byron)
July 18, 2008 Filing 23 REPLY in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and memorandum in support filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Neeley, Josiah)
July 18, 2008 Filing 22 REPLY in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and memorandum in support filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Randolph Wolfson)(Neeley, Josiah)
July 7, 2008 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and memorandum in support filed by Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy R Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez. (Grube, Charles)
July 7, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Van Wyck's Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Robert B Van Wyck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Demarchi, Kimberly)
July 7, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy R Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez. (Grube, Charles)
July 7, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Arnold Grube on behalf of Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy R Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez (Grube, Charles)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer to the Verified Complaint and response papers to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be due 7/7/08. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/1/08.(TLJ)
June 30, 2008 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Robert B Van Wyck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Demarchi, Kimberly)
June 30, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Demarchi on behalf of Robert B Van Wyck (Demarchi, Kimberly)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation that Defendants' answer and response papers shall be due 6/30/08. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/24/08. (TLJ)
June 18, 2008 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and memorandum in support, #1 Complaint, of acceptance of service by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babione, Byron)
June 5, 2008 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randolph Wolfson. Sherry L Geisler served on 5/23/2008; Catherine M. Stewart served on 5/23/2008; Marion Weinzweig served on 5/23/2008; J. Conrad Baran served on 5/23/2008; Daisy R Flores served on 5/23/2008; Jeff Messing served on 5/23/2008; John Pressley Todd served on 5/23/2008; William W. Horsley served on 5/23/2008; Laura Bellau served on 5/23/2008; Pamela M. Katzenberg served on 5/23/2008; Timothy Gooding served on 5/23/2008; Karen Osborne served on 5/23/2008; Robert B Van Wyck served on 5/23/2008; J. William Brammer, Jr served on 5/23/2008; John C Gemmill served on 5/23/2008; Angela H Sifuentes served on 5/23/2008; Robert M Brutinel served on 5/23/2008; Sylvia Patino-Branfon served on 5/23/2008; Harriett Chavez served on 5/23/2008; Sheila S Polk served on 5/23/2008; Louis Frank Dominguez served on 5/23/2008. (Neeley, Josiah)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 27, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 300, receipt number PHX071601 as to James Bopp, Jr, Josiah Simpson Neeley, Anita Y Woudenberg. (BAS, )
May 27, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anita Y. Woudenberg by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Woudenberg, Anita)
May 27, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James Bopp, Jr. by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James)
May 27, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Josiah Neeley by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Neeley, Josiah)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Frederick J. Martone. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 08-8064-PCT-FJM. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/22/08. (TLJ)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDARD TRACK ORDER. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/22/08. (TLB )
May 22, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint, filed by Randolph Wolfson. Description of deficiency: incorrect division selected. (MHA)
May 22, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sherry L Geisler, Catherine M. Stewart, Marion Weinzweig, J. Conrad Baran, Daisy Flores, Jeff Messing, John Pressley Todd, William W. Horsley, Laura Bellau, Pamela M. Katzenberg, Timothy Gooding, Karen Osborne, Robert B Van Wyck, J. William Brammer, Jr, John C Gemmill, Angela H Sifuentes, Robert M Brutinel, Sylvia Patino-Branfon, Harriett Chavez, Sheila S Polk, Louis Frank Dominguez. (MHA). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
May 21, 2008 Filing 3 Notice of Availability (MHA)
May 21, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV08-8064-PCT-JAT. CASE INITIALLY FILED IN PHOENIX DIVISION IN ERROR. Correct case number is as follows: CV-08-8064-PCT-JAT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHA)
May 21, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and memorandum in support by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babione, Byron)
May 21, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000001956784, filed by Randolph Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Exhibit 4 (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit 4 (Part 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit 5-10, #6 Summons)(Babione, Byron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfson v. Brammer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Concannon
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Weinzweig
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Eckerstrom
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Gooding
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd K Claycomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maret Vessella
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry L Geisler
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela H Sifuentes
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy R Flores
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela M Katzenberg
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence F Winthrop
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Gemmill
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Van Wyck
Represented By: Peter Robert Wand
Represented By: Peter D Baird
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Demarchi
Represented By: Kate Colleen Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriett Chavez
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Conrad Baran
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Tyrell Taber
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Osborne
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Patino-Branfon
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine M Stewart
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Frank Dominguez
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Brutinel
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O Miller
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Houle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila S Polk
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George H Foster
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W Horsley
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J William Brammer, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Bellau
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Messing
Represented By: Charles Arnold Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Wolfson
Represented By: Anita Y Woudenberg
Represented By: Benjamin W Bull
Represented By: Byron Jeffords Babione
Represented By: Jeffrey P Gallant
Represented By: Josiah Simpson Neeley
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?