Wine Group L.L.C. v. Oak Creek Vineyards & Winery Inc.

Plaintiff: Wine Group, L.L.C.
Defendant: Oak Creek Vineyards & Winery Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv08069
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' 65 Stipulation: that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/19/09. (KMG, )
December 4, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting the Settlement Conference to 2/3/2009 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. FURTHER ORDERED affirming all other Orders contained within the undersigned's Settlement Conference Order, docket #33, except for the date and time of said conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/3/08. (KMG, )
December 1, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - A Settlement Conference is set for 2/12/2009 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/25/08. (NOTE: See Order for full details)(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wine Group L.L.C. v. Oak Creek Vineyards & Winery Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wine Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sean David Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Creek Vineyards & Winery Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?