Lancer Insurance Company et al v. Western Distributing Company et al

Plaintiff: Lancer Insurance Company and Sina International, Inc.
Defendant: Western Distributing Company and Ronald Eugene Hale
Case Number: 3:2008cv08084
Filed: July 7, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 86 Stipulation of Dismissal; this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/5/10. (LSP)
March 2, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 82 Stipulation of Dismissal: the cause of action filed by Plaintiffs Lancer Insurance Company and Sina International, Inc.'s against Defendants Ronald Eugene Hale and Western Distributing, Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejud ice in its entirety. Dismissing said matter with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. All other parties and claims remain in the case. Lancer Insurance Company and Sina International, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/1/10. (DMT)
December 22, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 NOTICE of Settlement by Great American Insurance Company, Ronald Eugene Hale, Lancer Insurance Company, Yue Pang, Sina International, Inc., Western Distributing Company, Western Distributing Transportation Corp (McFetridge, Shane) filed by Lancer Insurance Company, Western Distributing Company, Sina International, Inc., Ronald Eugene Hale, Western Distributing Transportation Corp, Yue Pang, Great American Insurance Company. Final pretrial conference set 2/8/2010 is vacated. Status Conference set for 2/8/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/22/2009. (TCA, )
October 27, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Continue; the deadline for rebuttal expert reports shall be no later than December 15, 2009 and all other discovery shall be completed no later than December 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/27/09.(LSP)
November 24, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice Jane Doe Hale; John Doe and Jane Does I-X; Black and White Corporations I-X; and ABC Partnerships I-X. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/24/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancer Insurance Company et al v. Western Distributing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lancer Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael William Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sina International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael William Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Distributing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Eugene Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?