Herman H. Murphy v. Coconino County Sheriffs Department et al

Plaintiff: Herman H. Murphy
Defendant: Coconino County Sheriffs Department and Does
Case Number: 3:2008cv08089
Filed: July 16, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Clarification. This action has been dismissed with prejudice (see dkt 79 ). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/6/2009. (LAD)
July 31, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dft's 63 Motion to Dismiss; Pla's 73 Motion to Compel discovery and Motion for Sanctions is denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 07/31/09.(ESL, )
September 29, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft Coconino County Sheriff's Department's 16 Motion to Dismiss. Pla's motion 17 for leave to file amended complaint is granted. Pla shall file an amended complaint with this order by 10/10/08. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/08.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herman H. Murphy v. Coconino County Sheriffs Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman H. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coconino County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?