Davis, et al v. Lowe's HIW, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Richard Wasmer, James Helms, Caroline Helms, Anna L Davis, Lois D Pike, S Sue Harvey, Linda Schwab, Keith R Touw, Connie Touw, Margaret Valenta, Ronald E Gerhart and Shirley M Gerhart
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv08104
Filed: August 26, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED GRANTING dft's 71 Motion for Partial Summary Jgm. Summary jgm is granted on plas' trespass and negligence counts. Plas' nuisance count remains. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/18/09. (SAT)
July 27, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft's 51 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/27/2009. (LAD)
October 31, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING plas' "Renewed application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction" 15 . Because the dft cannot be harmed by complying with the law, no secur ity is required under Rule 65(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED enjoining dft Lowes, its officers, agents, servants, employees, and other persons who are in active concert or participation with them from: 1. Any construction that does not c omply with the City of Prescott's noise ordinance. 2. Unloading or moving materials after 10:00 p.m. or before 6:00 a.m. 3. Keeping bay doors open when moving materials inside the store. Such doors should be shut to muffle the sound. 4. Using th e outside intercom after 10:00 p.m. or before 6:00 a.m. 5. Allowing trucks (including those delivering and picking up materials) to idle their engines for longer than five minutes when loading or unloading. 6. Allowing dust and debris to leave its property during construction activities and otherwise. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/31/08. (Note: See Order for full details)(KMG, )
September 12, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Defendant Lowes HIW, Incorporated, shall file a Show Cause in writing by 9/25/2008 why Defendant and/or its counsel should not be sanctioned pursuant to the Court's inherent authority for failing to comply with the Court's prior order, including remand of this action back to State court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/12/08. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis, et al v. Lowe's HIW, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wasmer
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Helms
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Helms
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L Davis
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois D Pike
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Sue Harvey
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Schwab
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith R Touw
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Touw
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Valenta
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E Gerhart
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley M Gerhart
Represented By: Walter Gilmore Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc
Represented By: John Duke Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?