Piccini v. Wells Fargo Auto Finance et al

Plaintiff: John R. Piccini
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto Finance and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv08125
Filed: October 7, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/2009.(NVO)
February 11, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss Case. The parties are directed, within 30 days of the date of this order, to submit the matter to binding arbitration before the American Arbitration Association. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2009.(NVO)
February 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss Case. The parties are directed, within 30 days of the date of this order, to submit the matter to binding arbitration before the American Arbitration Association. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piccini v. Wells Fargo Auto Finance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Piccini
Represented By: Cary Ray Lundberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?