Dupris v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Dupris
Defendant: Selanhongva McDonald, Perry Proctor, Tino Lopez, Molly Hernandez, Daniel Hawkins and Perphelia Massey
Case Number: 3:2008cv08132
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 225 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 221 Order - granting the Individual Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 169 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' FTCA Claim (Doc. 168 ). FURTHER O RDERED denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgement (Doc. 170 ). FURTHER ORDERED dismissing the Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 126 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Mr. Robertson, Dr. Lyman, and Dr. Davis (Doc. 162 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/24/2012. (KMG)
January 9, 2012 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Individual Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 169 ). Granting the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' FTCA Claim (Doc. 168 ). Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 170 ). FURTHER ORDERED dismissing the Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 126 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Mr. Robertson, Dr. Lyman, and Dr. Davis (Doc. 162 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/9/2012.(KMG)
June 27, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Defendants' 145 Motion to Dismiss; the Complaint against McCoy and Youngman is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/27/11.(REW)
January 26, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 96 Motion to Amend their Complaint substituting McCoy and Youngman in lieu of named Defendant McDonald for purposes of Plaintiffs' Bivens claims; all Bivens claims against Defendant McDonald are dismissed; pursuant to the confidentiality agreement, Plaintiffs' 97 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1416 of the Fourth Amended Complaint is granted. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/26/11.(REW)
May 4, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying 51 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying as moot 57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 62 Motion to Amend/Correct complaint.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/4/2010.(TCA)
April 19, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Extension of Time.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss no later than April 20, 2010.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/19/2010.(TCA)
March 25, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Stipulation for extension to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Response is now due on April 19, 2010 and the Reply is now due on May 7, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel is advised that the briefs are to be newly drafted briefs, not replicas of the previously filed briefs. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/25/2010. (TCA)
January 13, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 19 Motion to Dismiss the Bivens claims filed against Defendants in the First Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's request to file a Second Amended Complaint in the event that the Court should grant the Motion to Dismiss is granted ; Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended complaint by 2/19/10; in light of the future filing of a Second Amended Complaint, the United States' pending Motion to Dismiss 18 is denied in part with prejudice as to the jurisdictional issue and denied in part without prejudice as to the FTCA claims. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/13/10.(REW, )
February 10, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSOLIDATION ORDER granting 14 Motion to Consolidate Cases to fhe following extent: (1) Dupris v. McDonald, CV-08-8132-PCT-LOA, is transferred to the Honorable Paul G. Rosenblatt for all further purposes; (2) Reed v. McDonald, CV-08-8133-PCT-PGR, is consolidated into Dupris v. McDonald, CV-08-8132-PCT-PGR, for all pretrial purposes. FURTHER ORDERED all future documents filed in this action, until otherwise ordered by the Court, shall be filed in Dupris v. McDonald, CV-08-8132-PCT-PGR. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/10/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupris v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Dupris
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selanhongva McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tino Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perphelia Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?