Reed v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Reed
Defendant: Selanhongva McDonald, Perry Proctor, Tino Lopez, Molly Hernandez, Daniel Hawkins, Perphelia Massey and Joshua Anderson
Case Number: 3:2008cv08133
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 15 Order - granting the Individual Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 169 in Lead case CV 08-8132-PCT-PGR ). FURTHER ORDERED granting the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' FTC A Claim (Doc. 168 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgement (Doc. 170 ). FURTHER ORDERED dismissing the Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 126 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Mr. Robertson, Dr. Lyman, and Dr. Davis (Doc. 162 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/24/2012. (KMG)
January 9, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Individual Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 169 in Lead case CV 08-8132-PCT-PGR). Granting the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' FTCA Claim (Doc. 168 ). Denying Plaintiffs' ; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 170 ). FURTHER ORDERED dismissing the Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 126 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Mr. Robertson, Dr. Lyman, and Dr. Davis (Doc. 162 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/9/2012. (KMG)
February 10, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Consolidate Cases to the following extent: (1) Dupris v. McDonald, CV-08-8132-PCT-LOA, is transferred to the Honorable Paul G. Rosenblatt for all further purposes; (2) Reed v. McDonald, CV-08-8133-PCT-PGR, is consolidate d into Dupris v. McDonald, CV-08-8132-PCT-PGR, for all pretrial purposes. FURTHER ORDERED all future documents filed in this action, until otherwise ordered by the Court, shall be filed in Dupris v. McDonald, CV-08-8132-PCT-PGR. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/10/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Reed
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selanhongva McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tino Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perphelia Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?