Wind River Resources, LLC et al v. Frisby et al

Plaintiff: Wind River Resources, LLC and Erika Van Alstine
Defendant: Herb Guenther, Karen Smith, Jack Riley, Bob Frisby, Doe Individuals I-V, XYZ Partnerships I-V and ABC Corporations I-V
Case Number: 3:2009cv08023
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that dft Jack Riley's alternative motion for a more definite statement 89 is denied. ORDERED granting 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting 90 Motion to Dismiss; granting 91 Motion to Dismiss; denying 104 Motion for Telephonic Status He aring. Motions 89 , 90 and 91 are granted to the following extent: the 2 federal claims...are both dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and the 7 state law claims...are all dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c)(3). The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/3/10.(LAD)
April 9, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 84 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel With Client's Consent, submitted on behalf of defendant Jack Riley, is stricken from the record without prejudice to being re-filed as an application in strict conformity with LRCiv 83.3(b). ORDER that the caption of all future documents filed in this action shall reflect the reassignment of this action to the undersigned Judge. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/8/09. (TLJ)
March 31, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plas shall file and serve an amended complaint no later than 4/27/09. Dfts shall file their answers or any motions to dismiss no later than 30 days after being served with the amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED denying 82 Motion to Dismi ss without prejudice to being re-filed after the filing and service of the amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the substitution of attorneys for dft Bob Frisby 80 , construed as an application for substitution of counsel pursuant to LRCiv 83.3(b ), is granted and Jon D. Schneider, Esq. of the law firm of Schneider & Onofry, P.C. is substituted as counsel for dft Bob Frisby in place of Robert P. Molina Esq. of the law firm of Pyatt Silvestri & Hanlon. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/31/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wind River Resources, LLC et al v. Frisby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wind River Resources, LLC
Represented By: Michael I Welker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Van Alstine
Represented By: Michael I Welker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Guenther
Represented By: Bryce C Loveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Represented By: Bryce C Loveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Riley
Represented By: Jeremiah Pendleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Frisby
Represented By: James P Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Individuals I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Partnerships I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?