v. Kindred Nursing Centers West, L.L.C.

Defendant: Kindred Nursing Centers West, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2009cv08102
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, pursuant to the stipulation, this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs; the status conference scheduled for 2/8/10 is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/11/10. (REW, )
December 22, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 NOTICE of Settlement by Thelma Bossort (Hume, David) filed by Thelma Bossort. Status Conference set for 2/8/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/22/2009. (TCA, )
December 2, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/15/2010. Dispositive motions due by 6/11/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/2/2009. (TCA, )
November 12, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss Case and to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/10/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Kindred Nursing Centers West, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Nursing Centers West, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?