Castle v. Eurofresh, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William W Castle
Defendant: Eurofresh, Inc., Arizona Department of Corrections, Dora B. Schriro, Charles L. Ryan and Arizona, State of
Case Number: 3:2009cv08114
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 86 Motion for Settlement Conference; denying without prejudice 87 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 3/3/11.(DMT)
January 7, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants State of Arizona, ADC, Schriro, and Ryan's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 70). Defendants State of Arizona, ADC, Schriro, and Ryan's Motion to Dismiss 70 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) granted as to the individual-capacity claims against Schriro and Ryan; (b) denied in all other respects. The individual-capacity claims against Schriro and Ryan State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss are dismissed. The remaining claims are against the State of Arizona, ADC, and Schriro and Ryan in their official capacity for violation of the ADA and RA. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/5/11.(DMT)
August 16, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 58 . Count I of the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice; Counts IV and V are dismissed; and Eurofresh is dismissed as a De fendant. State Defendants must answer Counts II and III. Defendants must answer the Second Amended Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Any answer or response must state the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. The Court may strike any answer, response, or other motion or paper that does not identify the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/10/10. (DMT)
April 21, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Pla's Motion to Stay Proceedings and Entry of Judgment Pending Appeal (Doc. #43.) Pla's Motion 43 to Stay Proceedings and Entry of Judgment Pending Appeal is denied. Pla has 1 5 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Pla fails to file an amended complaint within 15 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action, with prejudice, that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Pla a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/16/10.(KMG)
September 30, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied without prejudice. Pla's 9 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Service is denied, as premature pending Plas return of the service packets. Pla's 10 Motion for Status on Court Screening is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 09/30/09. (ESL)
September 21, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied as moot. Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint, this Order, and both summon s and request for waiver forms for Defendants Eurofresh Inc., Arizona Department of Corrections, Schriro, Ryan, and State of Arizona. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/21/09. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle v. Eurofresh, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William W Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurofresh, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?