Breedlove et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Billy J Breedlove, Jr. and Diana J Breedlove-Jones |
Defendant: |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., America's Servicing Company, Arch McDonald and Rebecca Williams |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv08135 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Prescott Division Office |
County: |
Navajo |
Presiding Judge: |
James A Teilborg |
Nature of Suit: |
Both |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
63
ORDER that Wells Fargo Bank's 58 Motion to Dismiss, Defendant Arch McDonald's 59 Motion to Dismiss, and Defendant Mark Bridgewater's 60 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 07/27/10. (ESL)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying without prejudice and with leave to re-urge if appropriate the 26 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying as moot the 29 Motion to Strike; denying as moot the 30 Motion for Summary Disposition; granting 35 Motion Requesting Permission t o File Electronically; denying as moot the 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot the 39 Motion to Strike; denying 40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 42 Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint; denying as moot the 51 Motion for Expedited Ruling; denying without prejudice and with leave to re-urge if appropriate 18 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; denying without prejudice and with leave to re-urge if appropriate the 19 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/10.(LAD)
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER that Wells Fargo's motion for more definite statement (doc 1-1 at 7) is granted. Plas shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order.... FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss (doc 1-1 at 7 and 5 ) are denie d without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED if plas fail to file an amended complaint, dfts shall re-respond to the complaint currently on file (doc 1-1 at 4); including re-filing any motions to dismiss if they deem such response to be appropriate. FURTHER ORDERED to the extent the complaint names "et al." as a dft, "et al." is dismissed.... FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this order, plas shall file a status report regarding service on dft Rebecca William. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/2/2009. (LAD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?