Levingston v. Piburn et al

Plaintiff: Lynnell Levingston
Defendant: Patricia Piburn, Victoria Earle, Steve West, David Gregory, Jody Tapia, Carol Haverstick, Erasmo Chavez, Mike Nuttall, Mel Cody, Jerry McLain, Vicki Wilkins, Kenneth Isaacson, Thomas Garms, Roger Vanderpool, David Denlinger and Raymon Piburn
Case Number: 3:2009cv08138
Filed: August 24, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 97 Report and Recommendation is adopted and the case is dismissed without prejudice. The Motions to Dismiss ( 92 and 93 ) are denied. The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 06/28/10. (ESL)
June 10, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the 4/29/2010 94 Motion to Continue this Matter on the Inactive Calendar, filed by Dfts Carol Haverstick, Erasmo Chavez, Patricia Piburn, Jerry McClain, and Thomas Garms, is DENIED as moot because more than 30 days has passed since the Dfts filed their Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/10/10. (SAT)
March 26, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED returning this matter to the Court's active calendar anddischarging the obligation of Pla or the Bankruptcy Trustee to respond to the 3/9/2010 82 Order. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 4/9/2010, Pla shallsubstitute or j oin the Bankruptcy Trustee, or show the Trustee's ratification of this lawsuit; or alternatively, Pla shall amend her complaint to allege the lawsuit is exempt from the bankruptcy estate or has been abandoned by the bankruptcy trustee. FURTHER O RDERED that Pla's failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this cause of action. FURTHER ORDERED that the 83 Motion of Dfts Haverstick and Chavez to Continue on Inactive Calendar is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/25/10. (SAT)
February 9, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court certifies that the appeal is frivolous. FURTHER ORDERED denying 76 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis re 79 Notice of Appeal - Amended, 75 Notice of Appeal. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/9/10.(LAD)
December 4, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Case stayed until 3/5/2010 for Possible Dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to Lawrence J. Warfield. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/3/09. (LSP)
September 24, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Service of Complaint and Summons by the US Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/23/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levingston v. Piburn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnell Levingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Piburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Earle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Haverstick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erasmo Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Nuttall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Garms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Denlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymon Piburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?