Lombardi v. Copper Canyon Academy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mary H. Lombardi
Defendant: Copper Canyon Academy, LLC, CRC Health Group, Inc., Aspen Education Group, Inc., Paul Taylor, Sarah Taylor, Josh White, Patricia White, Anne Harmes and Mark Harmes
Case Number: 3:2009cv08146
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the 56 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 01/20/11. (ESL)
September 21, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims for wrongful discharge in violation of A.R.S. §23-1501 (Count Six); wrongful discharge in violation of public policy (Count Seven); breach of implied du ty of good faith and fair dealing (Count Eight); intentional interference with contractual relations (Count Nine); breach of contract (Count Ten); intentional infliction of emotional distress (Count Eleven); and negligent infliction of emotional distress (Count Twelve) 43 is DENIED. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/21/10.(LAD)
January 11, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying w/o prejudice 29 Motion to Dismiss Case.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/11/2010.(TCA, )
January 5, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages;FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the LodgedProposed Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/5/2010.(TCA, )
December 28, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time; FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for Monday, February 8, 2010, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/28/2009.(TCA, )
November 19, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 17 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/18/09. (SAT)
October 22, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk shall file 20 Lodged Proposed Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/22/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lombardi v. Copper Canyon Academy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Canyon Academy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Health Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Education Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Harmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Harmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary H. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?