Allstate Life Insurance Company v. Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co., Inc., M.L. Stern & Co., LLC, Edward Jones, L.P., The Industrial Development Authority of the County of Yavapai, Prescott Valley, Town of, Prescott Valley Event Center, LLC, Prescott Valley Signature Entertainment, LLC, Global Entertainment Corporation, Fain Signature Group, LLC, Kutak Rock, L.L.P., Stinson Morrison & Hecker LLP, TL Hocking & Associates, LLC, Thomas L Hocking, W James Treliving, Richard Kozuback and Yavapai, County of
Case Number: 3:2009cv08162
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2014 1200 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Stipulation Regarding Non-Party Bondholders (Doc. 1142 , revised as Doc. 1144-1) is GRANTED, APPROVED AND ENTERED. FURTHER ORDERED that the claims of the Non-Allstate Plaintiff Bondholders against Defendants Prescott V alley Entertainment Center, LLC, Global Entertainment Corp., Richard Kozubak and James Treliving are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Establish That Allstate Has the Burden to Prove Loss Causation and Damag es for the Implied Rescissionary Damages Remedy 1162 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that The Global Defendants' request for a jury trial (Doc. 1163 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Allstate's Motion for Trial to the Court (Doc. 1161 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/20/2014. (KMG)
November 5, 2013 999 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER requesting a response from Plaintiffs to Hocking's request for the Court to supplement its aiding and abetting ruling as to them and to FSG and PVSE's assertion that the Court's grant to some Defendants on Plaintiffs 9; Negligent Misrepresentation claims should apply to all Defendants. The Plaintiffs shall file a joint response to both issues not to exceed ten pages by November 15, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendants' Motion (Doc. 960 ) as moot to the extent that the Parties' in their recent joint statement have agreed that no aiding and abetting fraud claim, and no A.R.S. § 44-1991(A)(3) claim remains against Kutak. The Parties further acknowledge that they no longer assert a negligent misrepresentation claim against the Town. (Doc. 978 at 5 n. 3.) Thus, the motion is also moot in that respect and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/4/2013. (KMG)
November 1, 2013 997 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting a response from Plaintiffs to Hocking's request for the Court to supplement its aiding and abetting ruling as to them and to FSG and PVSE's assertion that the Court's grant to some Defendants on Plaintiffs' Negligent Misrepresentation claims should apply to all Defendants. The Plaintiffs shall file a joint response to both issues not to exceed ten pages by November 15, 2013. ORDERED denying Defendants' 960 Motion as moot to t he extent that the Parties' in their recent joint statement have agreed that no aiding and abetting fraud claim, and no A.R.S. § 44-1991(A)(3) claim remains against Kutak. The Parties further acknowledge that they no longer assert a negligent misrepresentation claim against the Town. Thus, the motion is also moot in that respect and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/1/2013. (LFIG)
September 13, 2013 951 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 696 is denied as moot in part and denied in part; summary judgment is denied on the Town's counterclaim against Allstate for tortious interference; because the Town has withdrawn its third-party claim against Wells Fargo, the Motion on that ground is denied as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/13/13.(REW)
August 23, 2013 937 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Town of Prescott Valley's Request for Additional Rulings (Doc. 902 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Wells Fargo's remaining claims against the Town are DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Town of Prescott Valley's Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal (Doc. 913 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/22/2013.(KMG)
June 21, 2013 917 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, James W Treliving's Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal 797 is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/21/13.(REW)
June 10, 2013 894 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Stinson Morrison Hecker's 558 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/10/2013.(LFIG)
June 4, 2013 892 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Town of Prescott Valley's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 578 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/3/2013.(KMG)
March 21, 2013 762 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' 676 , 683 , 698 , 700 and 722 Stipulations to File Under Seal are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/21/2013. (LFIG)
March 1, 2013 655 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant James W. Treliving's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 574 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/1/2013.(KMG)
October 11, 2012 572 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims of Non-Party Bondholders (Doc. 530 ) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Wells Fargo will disclose the specific facts on which it bases its claims for each individual bondholder on or before November 8, 2012. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/11/2012.(KMG)
October 3, 2012 568 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for 10/10/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/3/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)
August 8, 2012 538 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Underwriters may conduct discovery into communications between Allstate and/or Wells Fargo and their respective in-house or outside counsel. This discovery is limited to communications that relate to the bond offering at issue in this case and that occurred between June 1, 2008 and November 19, 2008. Any supplemental depositions conducted by the Underwriters are limited to two hours. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/7/2012. (KMG)
May 24, 2012 507 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Fain Signature Group LLC and Prescott Valley Signature Entertainment, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 447 ) is DENIED. The Town of Prescott Valley's Motion to Reconsider (Doc. 449 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Section 10(b) claims against the Town of Prescott Valley are dismissed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/24/2012.(KMG)
January 23, 2012 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Joint Motion of Allstate Life Insurance Company, Covin Plaintiffs and Counterclaimant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Requesting Modification of Case Management Order (Doc. 373 ) is DENIED. The Town of Prescott Valley's Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims (Doc. 377 ) is GRANTED. The Underwriters' Motion to Amend Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim (Doc. 443 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/23/2012.(KMG)
December 2, 2011 439 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Doc. 331 is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/2/2011.(KMG)
November 18, 2011 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting/denying in part 263 Consolidated Motion to Dismiss the Underwriters' Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim; and Town of Prescott Valley's Counterclaims FURTHER ORDERED granting 281 Underwriters' Motion to Amend Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim against Third-Party Counterclaim Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/18/11.(MAP)
November 1, 2011 422 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Allstate Life Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss the Town of Prescott Valley's Counterclaims (Doc. 262) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/1/2011.(KMG)
October 21, 2011 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaints Filed by Allstate and the Covin Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction(Doc. 350) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay Order (Doc. 419) is lifted and that the following case deadlines are reset as follows: 1. Class Certification: The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Reply in support of the Covin Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification (Doc. 331) shall be November 4, 2011. 2. Fact Discovery: The deadline for completing fact discovery shall be July 23, 2012. 3. Disclosure of Experts and Expert Discovery: a. The party with the burden of proof shall provide full and complete expert disclosures as required by Rule 26(a)(2)(A)-(C) of the Fe deral Rules of Civil Procedure no later than August 20, 2012. b. The responding party shall provide full and complete expert disclosures as required by Rule 26(a)(2)(A)-(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than September 24, 2012. c. Expert depositions shall be completed no later than October 11, 2012. 4. Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions: Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than December 21, 2012. 5. Status Conference: A status conference is set for November 8, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/20/2011. (KMG)
July 26, 2011 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 354 Motion to Stay and staying all further discovery and proceedings in this case, until the Court rules on Defendant Prescott Valleys pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 350). It is further ordered vacating the Status Conference currently set for 08/12/11. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/26/11.(ESL)
November 4, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' filings, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 157-59, 164-65, 170, 173-74, 177) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent Allstate, the Class Action Plaintiffs, and/or the Trustee seek to amend the defects in their pleadings, they shall have until December 3, 2010 to do so. FURTHER ORDERED that due to the complexity of this case and the length of the parties' pleadings, if the parties seek to amend by submitting a Second Amended Complaint or an Amended Counterclaim, the parties shall: (1) provide the Court and all Defendants a redline indicating all changes from the prior pleading and amended pleading; and (2) provide the Court and all Defendants a conversion table indicating which paragraphs have been renumbered in the newly amended pleading. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/3/10. (NOTE: See Order For Full/Complete Details)(KMG)
June 10, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Wells Fargo's 140 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, 140 Motion for Interim Order Precluding Deposit of Funds into Court is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Towns 154 Motion to Deposit Money Subject to Interpleader with the Clerk of the Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/9/10. (SAT)
March 3, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: (1) Plas' 109 Joint Motion to Amend their Complaints is GRANTED; (2) Pla Allstate is directed to file its Amended Complaint and the Class-Action Plas are directed to file their Second Amended Complaint and serve the amended pleadings on all parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order; (3) Dfts' 115 Motion requesting a new briefing schedule and permission to both consolidate their motions to dismiss and exceed local rule 7.2(e) page limits is GRANTED; (4) Dfts SHALL have forty-five (45) days, or until 4/16/2010, to file new motions to dismiss; Plas shall have forty-five (days), or until 6/1/2010 to respond; and Dfts wil l have twenty-one days (21), or until 6/22/2010 to file their replies. No further extensions to these deadlines will be granted; (5) Dfts SHALL strictly adhere to the following page limitations when filing their motions to dismiss: Underwriters - 40 pages, The Town of Prescott Valley - 17 pages, The Law Firms - 30 pages, The Fain Entities - 17, pages; TL Hocking & Associates - 17 pages, The Authority -17 pages, Global Entertainment - 17 pages, and Prescott Valley Event Center - 17 pages; (6) The following Motions to Dismiss 75 , 76 , 80 , 81 , and 85 are DENIED as moot. (7) The following requests for judicial notice, 73 and 106 , are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/3/10. (SAT)
February 17, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Representative Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff 88 , 89 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Life Insurance Company v. Robert W. Baird & Co. Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Joseph LaVelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.L. Stern & Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Jones, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Industrial Development Authority of the County of Yavapai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Valley, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Valley Event Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Valley Signature Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fain Signature Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kutak Rock, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stinson Morrison & Hecker LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TL Hocking & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L Hocking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W James Treliving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kozuback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?