Villone et al v. United Parcel Services, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv08213
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Rule 56, Fed.R.Civ.P., The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/22/2011.(ALS)
January 31, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that the joint motion to extend the Rule 16 scheduling order's deadlines, doc. 41, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/31/11.(KMG)
June 25, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend Answer. Pursuant to LRCiv 15.1, as amended on December 1, 2009, Defendant must file and serve [the Amended Answer] on all parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the order granting leave to amend.... Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/25/10.(LAD)
January 13, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 8 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is granted; that the Complaint is corrected to reflect that Richard Rodriguez is not a pla in this case. The Clerk is kindly directed to modify the docket to reflect this change. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that future filings shall only include Regina Lynn Villone as Pla; that absent a timely request for an extension for good cause shown, all Dfts shall be timely served at Pla's expense within 120 days of November 30, 2009, the date Pla filed her Complaint, or this lawsuit may be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 01/07/10. (ESL)
December 9, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if Plaintiffs intend to allege a claim for Richard Rodriguez, Mr. Rodriguez shall sign an amended complaint and represent himself or Plaintiffs shall retain a lawyer, appropriately licensed to practice law in Arizona and admitted to practice in this District Court, who shall file an motion to amend the Complaint on or before Friday, January 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/9/09. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villone et al v. United Parcel Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?