Thompson v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Number: 3:2010cv08001
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 15 motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2). Defendants' motions to dismiss (Docs. 10, 13) are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 08/26/10. (ESL)
June 24, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until July 16, 2010 to file a response to each motion to dismiss (Dkt. 10 , 13 ). No further extensions will be granted. The Clerk is directed to mail to Plaintiff a copy of each motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is warned that the Court will summarily grant the motions to dismissif Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/24/10. (LAD)
February 8, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 , 6 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed with this case without prepayment of costs or fees FURTHER Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of process on all Defendants FURTHER denying 4 Request for appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/5/10.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?