Thompson v. Apache County, et al.

Plaintiff: Henry Thompson
Defendant: Michael Whiting, Joyclynn Whiting and Apache County
Case Number: 3:2010cv08009
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 181 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/2011.(NVO)
November 15, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 151 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/15/2011.(NVO)
December 22, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's 31 Motion to Amend Complaint. Pla shall file the proposed second amended complaint (see Doc. 31-1) by December 30, 2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/10.(KMG)
July 26, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Stay. Thc Court will set a scheduling conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/26/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Apache County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyclynn Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Thompson
Represented By: John Edward Charland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?