Fromkin v. IndyMac Bank FSB, et al.

Plaintiff: Christopher L Fromkin
Defendant: Quality Loan Services, Inc., IMB REO, LLC, OneWest Bank, FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, IndyMac Bank FSB and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2010cv08014
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 moving defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Nontaxable Espenses.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/9/10.(DMT)
June 18, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/17/10.(TLJ)
March 31, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/31/10.(DMT)
March 1, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint no later than 3/12/2010.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/1/2010.(TCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fromkin v. IndyMac Bank FSB, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMB REO, LLC
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Robert M Brochin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L Fromkin
Represented By: Douglas C Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?