Perkons v. American Acceptance, LLC.

Plaintiff: Joan Perkons
Defendant: American Acceptance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv08021
Filed: January 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plas' [sic] 24 Motion for Default Judgment Against Dfts [sic] American Acceptance, LLC is granted and that pla Joan Perkons is awarded a total of $13,388.38 from defendant American Acceptance, LLC, consisting of actual damages of $5,000.00 pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1692k(a)(1), statutory damages of $1,000.00 pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1692k(a)(2)(A), and $7,388.38 in attorneys fees and costs pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1692k(a)(3); that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/28/10. (ESL)
July 12, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the 17 Motion for Withdrawal of Cnsl is granted and that Sanford Jeffrey Germaine and the law firm of Casebolt, Germaine &Schenk, PLC are withdrawn as cnsl for dft American Acceptance, LLC. FURTHER ORDERED that dft Americ an Acceptance LLC shall have through 8/16/2010 in which to obtain new cnsl and to have that cnsl file a notice of appearance in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that dft American Acceptance LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than 8/25/2010.FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2010 is vacated and is reset to Monday, 10/4/2010, at 11:00 am. in Courtroom 601 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/12/10. (SAT)
June 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/7/10.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkons v. American Acceptance, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Perkons
Represented By: David James McGlothlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Acceptance, LLC
Represented By: Sanford Jeffrey Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?