Cettolin et al v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Fausto U Cettolin, Jr. and Donna L Cettolin
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, GMAC Mortgage, LLC and Executive Trustee Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv08036
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Entertain Motion for Relief on Consent Orders FRCP 60 (Doc. 48). (See document for details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/14/11.(LAD)
May 24, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING Plaintiffs' New Motion for Relief on Consent Orders FRCP 60 (Doc. 45) and the associated Request for Judicial Notice (Doc. 46). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/24/11.(LAD)
December 13, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the extent that the Reply filed 12/6/10 will be deemed timely; denying Plaintiffs' 34 Motion for Relief and for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/13/10.(REW)
September 24, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15). This case is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Doc. 24). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Cancel Oral Argument (Doc. 29). The oral argument currently set for October 4, 2010 is vacated. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/23/10.(LAD)
July 1, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Motion to Strike; denying 18 Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Cases; denying 18 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to dismiss (Doc. #15) by July 26, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 20 Motion for Summary Disposition and granting in part and denying in part 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, it is denied with respect to the motion to transfer, consolidate and stay; it is granted to the extent specified above with respect to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/1/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cettolin et al v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto U Cettolin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Cettolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?