Kanelos v. Mohave, County of et al

Plaintiff: Jim Kanelos
Defendant: Mohave, County of, Mohave County Board of Supervisors, Ron Walker, Matt Smith, William Ekstrom, Tom Sockwell, Buster Johnson, Gary Watson and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2010cv08099
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The following provision in AP 3-1 is hereby declared uncon stitutional as it applies to Plaintiff's nonobstructive distribution of leaflets around the MCAB: "Leafleting or distribution of flyers or other literature."Because this Order resolves all Plaintiff's claims against all parties, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/6/12.(DMT)
February 9, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED by (Doc. 59) - ORDER granting 24 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to the following claims: § 1983; civil conspiracy; as-applied and facial challenges to Administrative Procedure 3-1; punitive damages a gainst governmental entities or agents acting in their official capacities; and any remedy seeking an elected county official's removal from office. Plaintiff shall have 21 DAYS from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint with respe ct to his § 1983 and civil conspiracy claims, and his as-applied and facial challenges to Administrative Procedure 3- 1. If an amended complaint is not timely filed on these claims by March 2, 2011, they will be terminated consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/9/11.(DMT) Modified on 2/9/2011 (DMT).
July 15, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue; denying as moot 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Change Venue; denying 14 Western States' Constitutionlist Alliance, Inc.'s Petition for JoinderSigned by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/14/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanelos v. Mohave, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Kanelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave, County of
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Walker
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Smith
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ekstrom
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sockwell
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buster Johnson
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Watson
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?