Cooke et al v. Colorado City, Town of et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Cooke and Jinjer Cooke
Defendant: Colorado City, Town of, Hildale, City of, Hildale-Colorado City Utilities, Twin City Power, Unknown Parties and Twin City Water Authority Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2010cv08105
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 753 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: UEP's Renewed Motion for Order to Show Cause, (Doc. 749 ), is STAYED pending the issuance of Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Judge Holland in United States v. Town of Colorado City et al, No. 3:12-CV- 08123- HRH. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report with the Court within ten (10) days after the above-mentioned issuance. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/05/2016. (REK)
February 16, 2016 748 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that UEP's motion for Order to Show Cause, (Doc. 738 ), is DENIED, without prejudice. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/16/16. (LAD)
September 1, 2015 737 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court notes that Plaintiff State of Arizona has filed a "Notice of Filing Form of Judgment" (Doc. 736 ). Because this filing is not a motion, the Court will not take any action on it. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/1/2015. (TLB)
November 26, 2014 723 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION: The State of Arizona prevailed on its claims against Defendants Town of Colorado City, City of Hildale, Hildale- Colorado City Utilities, Twin City Water Authority, and Twin City Power. Judgment is entered in favor of the State of Arizona and against the Town of Colorado City in the amount of $50,000; against the City of Hildale in the amount of $50,000; against Hildale-Colorado City Utilities in the amount of $50,000; against Twin Ci ty Water Authority in the amount of $50,000; and against Twin City Power in the amount of $50,000. This injunction shall remain in place for ten years from the date of this Judgment, and the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce it. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/25/2014. (See attached PDF for details)(ALS)
November 25, 2014 722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 713 the State of Arizona's Motion to Amend the Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that within seven days from the date of this Order the officer(s) primarily responsible for approving new utility connections at Hildale-Colorado City U tilities, Twin City Water Authority, and Twin City Power and the officer(s) primarily responsible for creating and approving policies pertaining to utility service for the Town of Colorado City and the City of Hildale shall each file a certification stating under oath that he or she has read a copy of this Order and the Amended Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/25/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)
September 4, 2014 704 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION: The State of Arizona prevailed on its claims against Defendants Town of Colorado City, City of Hildale, Hildale-Colorado City Utilities, Twin City Water Authority, and Twin City Power. Judgment is entered in favor o f the State of Arizona and against the Town of Colorado City in the amount of $50,000; against Hildale-Colorado City Utilities in the amount of $50,000; against Twin City Water Authority in the amount of $50,000; and against Twin City Power in the amount of $50,000.00. This injunction shall remain in place for ten years from the date of this Judgment, and the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce it. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/4/2014. (LFIG)
May 6, 2014 643 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court has considered the parties' post-verdict memoranda and briefing. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file, on or before May 16, 2014, a proposed form of judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may file, on or before May 26, 2014 , a response to Plaintiffs proposed form of judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file, within ten (10) days after thefiling of Defendants response, a reply to Defendants response containing such points of authorities and argument as they de em necessary. FURTHER ORDERED that there will be no hearing on the proposed form of judgment unless as the Court may order on its own motion at a later date. (See attached order for details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/6/2014. (TLB)
October 18, 2013 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 467 Defendant Hildale's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Counts 6, 8 and 9. (see attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/17/2013.(TLB)
September 19, 2013 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 432 Motion to Intervene filed by St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and the Travelers Indemnity Company. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/19/13.(SJF)
June 20, 2013 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 347 Joint Motion to Seal Privileged Motion in Limine Exhibits. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall strike: (1) Exhibits 3-6 (lodged at Doc. 349 ) to Defendants' Motion to Preclude Exhibits to Robert Foster' s Deposition; (2) Exhibits A and B (lodged at Doc. 352 ) to the Hildale Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding Certain Letters allegedly from David Zitting; (3) exhibit 1 (lodged at Doc. 353 ) to Defendant To wn of Colorado City's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Letters that Joseph Allred allegedly Wrote; and (4) exhibit A (lodged at Doc. 357 ) to the Hildale Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony regarding Alleged C ommunications with Clergy. FURTHER ORDERED that, by 5:00 p.m. on 6/21/13, Defendants shall file (1) public copies of the exhibits they previously lodged in support of their motions in limine; (2) a notice indicating that Defendants request the Court rule on the relevant motions in limine without the sealed exhibits; or (3) a notice of withdrawal of the relevant motions in limine. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/20/13.(MAP)
February 13, 2013 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 264 Town of Colorado City's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 266 the Cooke Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 267 City of Hildale, Hild ale-Colorado City Utilities, Twin City Power, and Twin City Water Authority's Motion for Summary Judgment and the Hildale Defendants' request to dismiss the Hildale-Colorado City Utilities as non-jural entities is denied without prejudice; denying 269 Plaintiff-Intervenor State of Arizona's Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDER that within 20 days of the date of this Order, the Cooke Plaintiffs and Defendant Colorado City shall submit separate trial memoranda to the Court (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/13/13.(TLJ)
November 16, 2012 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 275 the United States' Motion to Transfer Related Case. The Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in CV-12-8123-PCT-HRH and CV-10-8105-PCT-JAT. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/16/12.(TLJ)
May 16, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Hildale-Colorado City Utilities', Twin City Power's, and City of Hildale's Motion to Stay 60 is denied. ORDER that Defendants temporarily granted stay of discovery 77 is lifted. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/16/11. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke et al v. Colorado City, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cooke
Represented By: William G Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinjer Cooke
Represented By: William G Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado City, Town of
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildale, City of
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildale-Colorado City Utilities
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Power
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Water Authority Incorporated
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?