Eaton v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Steven James Eaton
Respondent: Charles Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 3:2010cv08134
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 14 Motion for Reconsideration and request for counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/17/2011.(KMG)
June 8, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Magistrate Judge Duncan's R & R (Doc. 10) is ACCEPTED. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATE this action. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v.McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/8/11. (KMG)
November 1, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 4 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1) and this Order on the Respondents by certified mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 da ys of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/1/10.(ESL)
August 3, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a completed A pplication to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. The Clerk of Court must mail to Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/2/10. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven James Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?