Rich v. Wexford Health Sources Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Michael James Rich
Defendant: Wexford Health Solutions and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2010cv08178
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY ORDER re: 65 MOTION for Reconsideration. See PDF document for the court's PRELIMINARY consideration of the motion. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 5/15/14. (JWS)
September 5, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 60 Report and Recommendation of the magistrate judge. Plaintiff's remaining claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/5/13. (LSP)
September 4, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending 1 Complaint and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 9/4/13. (LSP)
January 7, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 Filing Fee. Plaintiff is granted 60 days from the filing date of this Order in which to discover, by subpoena or otherw ise, the identity of each of the Doe Defendants and to file a "notice of substitution" providing each of the Defendant's names in place of their fictitious identities. The Clerk shall dismiss the Doe Defendants if Plaintiff fails to co mply. The Clerk must issue three subpoenas in blank and send them to Plaintiff. Defendant Wexford Health Solutions must answer Counts I and II. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including 1 Complaint, this Order, and both summons and r equest for waiver forms for Defendant Wexford Health Solutions. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/5/11. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Wexford Health Sources Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?