EXC Incorporated et al v. Jensen et al

Plaintiff: EXC Incorporated, Conlon Garage Incorporated, Go Ahead Vacations, National Interstate Insurance Company and Russell J Conlon
Defendant: Jamien Rae Jensen and Chavis Johnson
Case Number: 3:2010cv08197
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 81 Joint Stipulations regarding Documents for Purposes of Motions for Summary Judgment are granted. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 99 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a declaratory judgment that the Kayenta District Court lacks jurisdiction to hear the Jensen Defendants' claims relating to the September 21, 2004 state highway accident. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Jensen Defendants are permanently enjoined from proceeding with the claims relating to the September 21, 2004 state highway accident in Kayenta District Court. The Jensen Defendants' 101 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/9/2012.(LFIG)
January 11, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Jensen Defendants' 84 Motion to Extend the Discovery Disclosure Date and Dispositive Motion Deadline is denied in part and granted in part; that, in the event of a discovery dispute, the parties shall jointly contact the Court via conference call to request a telephonic conference prior to filing any written discovery motions. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 01/11/12. (see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
November 2, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Litigation Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 66) and the Navajo Court Defendants' Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 70) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Jensen Defendants' Motion to Extend the Discovery Closure Date and Dispositive Motions Deadline (Doc. 68) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: IT IS ORDERED that the deadline to file dispositive motions be extended to February 27, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint copy of the record submitted to the Navajo Nation Supreme Court by November 30, 2011. If either party can show cause as to why that record is inadequate, that party may file a motion to extend the discovery deadline concurrently with the joint copy of that record. In all other respects, the Motion to Extend the Discovery Closure Date and Dispositive Motions Deadline (Doc. 68) is denied. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/11.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EXC Incorporated et al v. Jensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXC Incorporated
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conlon Garage Incorporated
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Go Ahead Vacations
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell J Conlon
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamien Rae Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavis Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?