Begay v. United States of America

Petitioner: Ivan Ray Begay
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv08221
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant/Movant's Motion to Reopen Habeas Corpus Pursuant to Fed.R. of Civ.P. Rule 60(B)(1-6) 43 is denied; no Certificate of Appealability shall issue and that the Defendant is not entitled to appeal in forma pauperis because he has f ailed to show that reasonable jurists would find this Court's assessment of the constitutional claims debatable or wrong, or that reasonable jurists would find it debatable whether he has stated a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right or debatable whether the Court was correct in its procedural ruling. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/7/16. (REW)
August 4, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendant Begay's Motion to Reinstate Habeas Corpus Proceedings (Doc. 39 ), filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(6), is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability shall not issue and that defend ant Begay shall not be allowed to appeal in forma pauperis because jurists of reason would not find it debatable whether the Court abused its discretion in denying Begay's Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b) motion, and jurists of reason would not find it debatable whether Begays underlying § 2255 motion stated a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/04/2015.(REK)
July 27, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Begay's Motion to Re-Open Habeas Corpus Petition, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 35 is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Begay's Motion to Re-Open Habeas Corpus 36 Is denied; No Certificate of Appealability shall issue and the defendant is not entitled to appeal in forma pauperis because he has failed to show that reasonable jurists would find this Court's assessment of the constitutional claims debatable or wrong, or that reasonable jurists would find it debatable whether he has stated a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right or debatable whether the Court was correct in its procedural ruling, re: 00-1222-PHX-PGR. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/27/15. (REW)
July 30, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Movant's 32 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Pleading Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2242, and Rule 15(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/25/2013.(LFIG)
June 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, movant Ivan Ray Begay's Motion for Relief Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(1-6) 25 , Motion for Leave to Amend and Lodge (Submit) a Proposed Amended Motion to Vacate 26 , Motion for Relief From a Judgment or Order 28 , and Motion for Leave to Amend and Lodge (Submit) a Proposed Amended Motion to Vacate 29 are all denied for lack of jurisdiction; no Certificate of Appealability shall issue, and the movant shall not be entitled to appeal in forma pauperis, because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/11/13. (REW)
March 14, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the defendant/movant's 11 [Motion] Requesting All Court Documents, and Part Written [sic] Objection of Denied Recommendation, signed on 03/05/11 and filed on 03/10/111, is denied. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 03/14/11. (ESL)
March 7, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 6 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted by the Court; that the defendant/movant's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody is denied as time-barred and that this action is dismissed; that no certificate of appealability shall issue and that the petitioner is not authorized to appeal in forma pauperis because the dismissal of the § 2255 motion is justified by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 03/06/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Begay v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivan Ray Begay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Vincent Quill Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?