Fleck v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Robin Fleck
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Incorporated, Unknown Parties and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2007-HE2
Case Number: 3:2010cv08256
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Defendants' motion for attorneys' fees related to Plaintiff's motion to strike (Doc. 55) is granted in part as set forth above. Defendants are awarded attorneys' fees of $4,513.05 against Plaintiff's counsel Douglas C. Rhoads. 2. Defendants' second motion for attorneys fees (Doc. 59) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/9/12.(LAD)
May 9, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. By May 18, 2012, Defendants shall file a memorandum and supporting material setting forth the attorneys' fees and costs incurred in defending against this action. By May 25, 2012, Plaintiff shall file a response. By May 31, 2012, Defendants shall file a reply. The initial memoranda shall not exceed seven pages each (exclusive of attachments) and the reply shall not exceed four pages. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/9/12.(LAD)
April 27, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Strike. Defendants shall file memorandum and supporting material setting forth attorneys' fees and costs incurred in responding to Plaintiff's motion on or before 5/4/2012; Plaintiff shall file a response on or before 5/11/2011; Defendants shall file a reply on or before 5/16/12. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/27/2012.(NVO)
March 8, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Quality Loan Service's 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/8/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleck v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Fleck
Represented By: Douglas C Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Incorporated
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: Tawn T Pritchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2007-HE2
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Represented By: Tawn T Pritchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?