Kentera et al v. Fremont Investment and Loan et al

Plaintiff: Jay Kentera and Julie Kentera
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of July 1, 2006 Securitized Asset-Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2006-FR3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-FR3, Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, Barclays Capital Real Estate Incorporated, Old Republic Default Management Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2010cv08259
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. FURTHER ORDERED enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement as follows: Plaintiff shall submit a stipulation to dismiss its claim with prejudice within five days of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice Defendants' request for attorney's fees as premature. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/25/2014.(LMR)
April 26, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/26/12.(DMT)
April 4, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/4/12.(TLJ)
September 8, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFOR ORDERED denying Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, Doc. 20, and denying Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Disposition of Motion to Remand as moot, Doc. 29. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Old Republic Defendants' Motion to D ismiss, Doc. 14, and awarding reasonable attorneys' fees and costs in connection therewith and upon IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Ocwen, HomEq, Wells Fargo and MERS, Doc 15. The Motion is granted in its entirety with respect to Defendants HomEq and MERS. Thus, the Complaint is dismissed as to both Defendants, with leave to amend to the extent permitted by the above Order. Count two of the Complaint is dismissed as to Defe ndant Ocwen with leave to amend to the extent permitted by the above Order. The motion is denied as it pertains to Defendant Wells Fargo. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should Plaintiffs desire to file an amended complaint, they shall do so no later than October 7, 2011. The Court will dismiss any aspect of the amended complaint that does not comply with the requirements of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint by October 7, 2011, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate MERS and HomEq as Defendants in this matter. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/8/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentera et al v. Fremont Investment and Loan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of July 1, 2006 Securitized Asset-Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2006-FR3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-FR3
Represented By: Christopher Robert Blevins
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin Ruth Ford
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Real Estate Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Robert Blevins
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Default Management Services
Represented By: Erin Ruth Ford
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Kentera
Represented By: Barbara Janet Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Kentera
Represented By: Barbara Janet Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?