Del Mar Land Partners LLC v. Stanley Consultants Incorporated

Plaintiff: Del Mar Land Partners LLC
Defendant: Stanley Consultants Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2011cv08013
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 Stanley Consultants Inc's Motion for Entry of Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment for defendant Stanley Consultants, Inc. and against plaintiff Del Mar Land Partners, LLC as to all claims se t forth in the plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 8 ), and for defendant Stanley Consultants, Inc. and against plaintiff Del Mar Land Partners, LLC on the defendant's Counterclaim for Breach of Contract (Doc. 24 ) in the principal amo unt of $17,592.75, plus prejudgment interest at the contractual rate of 18% and postjudgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a) at the rate of 0.09%, and for taxable costs. The motion is denied without prejudice to the extent that it seeks to add nonparty Del Mar Land, LLC as a judgment debtor. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/1/14.(LSP)
September 27, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant Stanley Consultants, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 56 (Doc. 80 ) is granted and that plaintiff Del Mar Land Partners, LLC's Breach of Contract claim, the First Cause of Action of the Amended Complaint and its Unjust Enrichment and Constructive Trust claim, the Fourth Cause of Action of the Amended Complaint, are both dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Stanley Consultants, Inc.'s Moti on for Summary Judgment as to Defendant/Counterclaimant's Counterclaim Pursuant to FRCP 56 (Doc. 86 ) is granted as to the defendant's Breach of Contract counterclaim, the First Cause of Action in the Counterclaim, and is denied as moot as to the defendant's Declaratory Relief counterclaim, the Second Cause of Action in the Counterclaim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Stanley Consultants, Inc. shall, after consultation with the plaintiff, submit a proposed form a judgment n o later than October 7, 2013. If the plaintiff cannot agree with the defendant's proposed form of judgment, the plaintiff shall submit its objections to that proposal no later than October 21, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/27/2013.(KMG)
November 5, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Accept Responses to Requests for Admission (Doc. 67 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's Motion to Strike Unauthorized Declaration of Bruce Silver Pursuant to F.R.Cp. 12(f) and Local R ules of Civil Procedure 7.2(m) (Doc. 71 ) is denied without prejudice as currently being moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 56 (Doc. 50 ) and Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant/Counterclaimant's Counterclaim Pursuant to FRCP 56 (Doc. 56 ) are both denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing motions for summary judgment is extended to December 21, 2012. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/5/2012.(KMG)
March 26, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant's 35 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(c) and Arizona's Economic Loss Rule is granted and that the plaintiffs Fraud claim, the Third Cause of Action in the Amended Complaint, is dismissed. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 03/26/12. (ESL)
July 12, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), 12(b)(6), 12(g) (Doc. 12) is granted solely to the extent that the plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation claim, the Second Caus e of Action in the Amended Complaint, is dismissed, and the motion is denied in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's [Alternative] Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. 12) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court has set a Scheduling Conference for Monday, August 1, 2011, at 11:15 a.m., in Courtroom 601 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/11/2011. (KMG)
January 26, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that the complaint 1 is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action no later than February 7, 2011. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall immediately serve a copy of this Order upon the defendant if the defendant has already been served with process. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/26/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Mar Land Partners LLC v. Stanley Consultants Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Consultants Incorporated
Represented By: Jacqueline C Pons-Bunney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Mar Land Partners LLC
Represented By: Morgan JC Scudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?