Colorado City, Town of v. United Effort Plan Trust et al

Plaintiff: Colorado City, Town of
Defendant: Bruce Wisan and United Effort Plan Trust
Case Number: 3:2011cv08037
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's and Plaintiff-Intervenors' 125 , 127 Motions for Summary Judgment are denied in part, and Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' separate 130 , 131 , 129 , 135 Motions for Summary Judgment are grante d in part with respect to the first count in Plaintiff's and Plaintiff-Intervenors' complaints. Plaintiff's and Plaintiff-Intervenors' 125 , 127 Motions for Summary Judgment are granted in part, and Defendants' and Defen dant-Intervenors' separate 130 , 131 , 129 , 135 Motions for Summary Judgment are denied in part, with respect to the second count in Plaintiff's and Plaintiff-Intervenors' complaints as set forth in this order. Defendant-Interven or Arizona Attorney General's 137 Request for Judicial Notice is granted. Defendants Hildale's and Colorado City's 180 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/8/2013.(LFIG)
November 29, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 111 Third Motion to Intervene is granted with the restrictions noted above. The 110 Motion to Expedite is denied as moot. Hildale Intervenors may file their proposed complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/29/2012.(LFIG)
November 26, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Attorney General's 93 Motion to Intervene is granted. The Clerk is directed to file the answer by the Attorney General lodged at (Doc. 94). The Attorney General shall comply with the schedule set forth in the Court's 52 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/26/2012.(LFIG)
October 16, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 73 Motion to Stay is denied. The parties shall contact the Court by December 12, 2012, if the Tenth Circuit has not issued a decision in FLDS v. Wisan et al. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/15/2012.(LFIG)
July 25, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Utah Attoney General's 56 Motion to Intervene is granted. Utah Attorney General shall comply with the schedule set forth in the Court's 52 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/25/2012.(LFIG)
February 22, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Dismiss. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/22/12.(LAD)
January 4, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Dismiss; denying 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court will set a case management hearing by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/4/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado City, Town of v. United Effort Plan Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado City, Town of
Represented By: Lisa S Wahlin
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Wisan
Represented By: Michael Lee Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Effort Plan Trust
Represented By: Michael Lee Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?