Smith et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Philip A Smith and Amy R Smith
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank FA, Green Tree Servicing LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2011cv08046
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/2011.(NVO)
July 28, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Green Tree's motion to dismiss (Doc. 15) is granted as stated above. 2. Chase and WaMu's motion to dismiss (Doc. 12) is granted in part and denied in part as stated above. 3. The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/11.(LAD)
April 18, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Ex Parte Motion for TRO and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/18/11. (cc: All Parties) (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank FA
Represented By: Steven A Hirsch
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Represented By: Steven A Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A Smith
Represented By: Christopher Legrand Scileppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy R Smith
Represented By: Christopher Legrand Scileppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?