Ellsworth v. Prison Health Services Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: James Jackson Ellsworth
Defendant: Prison Health Services Incorporated and Unknown Mortenson
Case Number: 3:2011cv08070
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2014 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Attorneys Myer and McKay: Kevin R. Myer and Todd N. McKay are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record on this case. Defendants Prison Health Services, Inc. n/k/a Corizon Health, Inc., and Kirsten Mortenson will continue to be represented by the same firm, Renaud Cook Drury Mesaros, PA, and by J. Scott Conlon who has represented Defendants from the beginning of this case. Signed by Judge John A Jarvey on 4/16/2014. (ALS)
December 12, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to: (a) Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Re: Plaintiff's Criminal History (Doc. 138);(b) Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert Witness for Trial (Doc. 139); and(c) Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants/Request for Show Cause Hearing (Doc. 144); the court FURTHER ORDERS that: the Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Re: Plaintiff's Criminal History (Doc. 138 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the def endants may not introduce evidence of the specificsof the plaintiff's felony conviction, but it is DENIED insofar as the defendants are seeking to introduce evidence of the date of plaintiff's felony conviction and that he is currently ser ving a ten year sentence for that conviction. This evidence will be admitted for the limited purpose ofimpeachment. the Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert Witness for Trial (Doc. 139 ) is DENIED; the Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Sancti ons AgainstDefendants/Request for Show Cause Hearing (Doc. 144 ) is DENIED; the Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants['] Notice of Appearance/Request to Remove Defendants['] Counsel (Doc. 148 ) is DENIED; and the plaintiff's " ;Motion for District Court Order Re: Stephen D. Brown Affidavit" (Doc. 155 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiff's "Motion for Transcripts" (Doc. 157 ) is DENIED; the plaintiff's "Motion to Reconsider Magistrate's Order&quo t; (Doc. 163 ) is denied; the parties are to appear telephonically on the 13th day of January, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of discussing the time frames which need to be determined with respect to their Joint Pretrial Statement and Final Pret rial Order (Doc. 154). Defense counsel shall provide the Court with a telephone number where plaintiff may be contacted and make the necessary arrangements for his appearance by telephone at the hearing; and with respect to the Joint Pretrial Statement and Final Pretrial Order (Doc. 154 ), in light of the rulings herein, the court strikes page 18:19-23. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/12/2013.(KMG)
September 13, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' 9/5/13 letter request is denied; the 1/4/13 order 127 is to be sealed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/12/13. (REW)
September 4, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying as moot 158 Plaintiff's Motion for a Copy of the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/4/2013.(Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff James Ellsworth on 9/4/2013).(TLB)
May 22, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' Motion for Two-Week Extension of time 149 to File Joint Pretrial Statement and Pretrial Order is granted; the Joint Pretrial Statement and Pretrial Order are due on 6/3/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/21/13.(REW)
March 20, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion for District Court's Reconsideration of Magistrates Denial of Plaintiff's motion to Appoint Counsel 131 is denied; Plaintiff's Motion to Expand the Time to File a Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order 132 is granted; the Parties shall have 60 days from the date of this Order by which to lodge a joint pretrial statement and proposed order. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/20/13. (REW)
January 4, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 76 ; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 76 is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/3/13.(REW)
October 24, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Clerk is hereby ordered, upon request, to provide the returned documents (returned 10/22/12), in person, to a representative of the law firm of Renaud Cook Drury Mesaros PA. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/24/12. (REW)
September 18, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Sealed Documents. ORDERED granting 94 Defendant's Motion for Qualified Protective Order and Motion to Seal, and that the original and any copies of Defendant's Exhibit "C" and Exhibit "E", as attached to De fendant's Motion for Protective Order Striking Certain Documents in the Record and Requiring Plaintiff to Return Documents (Doc 93 ), be placed under seal and not incorporated into the regular record of this case, and they shall remain under seal under further order of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/11/12.(MAP)
May 8, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion to Seal Attachment 1 to its Motion for Summary Judgment, and that the original and any copies of Defendants' Attachment 1 be placed under seal and not incorporated into the regular record of this case, and they shall remain under seal under further order of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/7/12.(MAP)
April 16, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 65 Motion for District Court Review of Magistrate[']s Order is denied and Plaintiff's 67 Motion for District Court Review of Magistrate[']s Order is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/16/12. (TLJ)
March 31, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, for all of the reasons set forth in this order, the court hereby orders that plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin Defendants 17] is: (1) DENIED as moot insofar as plaintiff is seeking a stayof this motion; (2) GRANTED to the extent he is seeking to correct the name of defendant Prison Health Services, Inc., to reflect its new name, Corizon Health Services, Inc.; (3) DENIED insofar as plaintiff is seeking to join American Service Group, Inc. and Valitas Health Services, Inc. as defendants her eto; and (4) insofar as plaintiff is seeking "to extend the deadlines for any Motion to Amend until such a time that [he] has enough evidence to prove who the Parent Corporation was during the timeframes [sic] setout [sic] in the complaint, and [to] file a Motion to Join the Parent Corporation[,]" this aspect of plaintiff's motion is DENIED with leave to seek leave to amend, provided such motion seeking leave to amend, if any, shall be filed no later than 5/4/12. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/31/12. (REW)
May 6, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James Jackson Ellsworth. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/6/11. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellsworth v. Prison Health Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mortenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?